This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/11/2022 at 07:39:39 (UTC).

ALEJANDRO PERALTA TAMPA VS. SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/29/2021 ALEJANDRO PERALTA TAMPA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alejandro Peralta Tampa

Defendants

HSBC Bank, USA

National Default Servicing Corporation

Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CDLG, PC

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY TAMPA, ALEJANDRO PERALTA ON 11/29/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY TAMPA, ALEJANDRO PERALTA ON 11/29/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TAMPA, ALEJANDRO PERALTA ON 11/29/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TAMPA, ALEJANDRO PERALTA ON 11/29/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TAMPA, ALEJANDRO PERALTA ON 11/29/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TAMPA, ALEJANDRO PERALTA ON 11/29/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12975912 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12803831.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12975912 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12803831.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/06/2022 AT 09:30:00 AM IN N17 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/06/2022 AT 09:30:00 AM IN N17 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY TAMPA, ALEJANDRO PERALTA ON 12/06/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY TAMPA, ALEJANDRO PERALTA ON 12/06/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY TAMPA, ALEJANDRO PERALTA ON 12/06/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY TAMPA, ALEJANDRO PERALTA ON 12/06/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY TAMPA, ALEJANDRO PERALTA ON 12/06/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY TAMPA, ALEJANDRO PERALTA ON 12/06/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: GRIFFIN; Department: N17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY TAMPA, ALEJANDRO PERALTA ON 12/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21096731 RECEIVED ON 12/06/2021 04:06:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY TAMPA, ALEJANDRO PERALTA ON 12/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31094024 RECEIVED ON 12/06/2021 04:06:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY TAMPA, ALEJANDRO PERALTA ON 12/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41272031 RECEIVED ON 12/06/2021 04:06:56 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/06/2022 AT 09:30:00 AM IN N17 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12975912 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12803831.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21093460 RECEIVED ON 11/29/2021 07:18:45 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GRIFFIN, CRAIG ON 11/29/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TAMPA, ALEJANDRO PERALTA ON 11/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TAMPA, ALEJANDRO PERALTA ON 11/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY TAMPA, ALEJANDRO PERALTA ON 11/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATIOIN is a litigant

Latest cases where HSBC Bank USA, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant