This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:21:09 (UTC).

ALAN KAU VS. GUY EDWARDS

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 ALAN KAU filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GUY EDWARDS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RONI SHRIRA

ALAN KAU

Defendant

GUY EDWARDS

Interested Party

RUSSELL JAY SINGER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROGERS, MACLEITH & STOLP, LLP

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACHMENT ORDER TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER ETC (ATTACHMENT) FILED BY KAU, ALAN ON 08/19/2013

APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACHMENT ORDER TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER ETC (ATTACHMENT) FILED BY KAU, ALAN ON 08/19/2013

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY KAU, ALAN; SHRIRA, RONI ON 10/22/2013

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY KAU, ALAN; SHRIRA, RONI ON 10/22/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11518984 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11342786.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11518984 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11342786.

CASE REASSIGNED TO FREDERICK AGUIRRE EFFECTIVE 01/06/2014.

CASE REASSIGNED TO FREDERICK AGUIRRE EFFECTIVE 01/06/2014.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11472556 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11296468.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11472556 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11296468.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 03/27/2014 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 03/27/2014 09:00:00 AM.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2311377 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2311377 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3289747 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3289747 REJECTED.

NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND HEARING FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND WRITS OF ATTACHMENT FILED BY KAU, ALAN ON 08/19/2013

NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND HEARING FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND WRITS OF ATTACHMENT FILED BY KAU, ALAN ON 08/19/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11544078 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11367935.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11544078 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11367935.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF 3RD PARTY 05/08/2014 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF 3RD PARTY 05/08/2014 09:00:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11431497 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11255369.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11431497 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11255369.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY KAU, ALAN ON 03/20/2014

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY KAU, ALAN ON 03/20/2014

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY KAU, ALAN; SHRIRA, RONI ON 10/21/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY KAU, ALAN; SHRIRA, RONI ON 10/21/2013

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 10/23/13) RECEIVED ON 10/22/2013.

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 10/23/13) RECEIVED ON 10/22/2013.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KAU, ALAN; SHRIRA, RONI ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KAU, ALAN; SHRIRA, RONI ON 08/12/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11768278 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11592501.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11768278 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11592501.

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR THIRD PARTY EXAM FILED BY KAU, ALAN; SHRIRA, RONI ON 04/10/2015

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR THIRD PARTY EXAM FILED BY KAU, ALAN; SHRIRA, RONI ON 04/10/2015

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF 3RD PARTY 06/11/2015 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY KAU, ALAN; SHRIRA, RONI ON 05/19/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3289748 RECEIVED ON 05/19/2015 06:41:59 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3289747 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF 3RD PARTY 05/14/2015 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF 3RD PARTY CONTINUED TO 06/11/2015 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF 3RD PARTY SCHEDULED FOR 06/11/2015 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C66 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY KAU, ALAN; SHRIRA, RONI ON 05/06/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3285910 RECEIVED ON 05/06/2015 03:49:27 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF 3RD PARTY SCHEDULED FOR 05/14/2015 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C66 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 465618 RECEIVED ON 08/19/2013 01:47:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 350618 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 349338 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/04/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MOSS, ROBERT ON 08/12/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11431497 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11255369.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KAU, ALAN; SHRIRA, RONI ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KAU, ALAN; SHRIRA, RONI ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY KAU, ALAN; SHRIRA, RONI ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 462702 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 06:08:25 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less