This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/11/2019 at 08:02:10 (UTC).

AHMED ELDEFRAWY VS. CIM GROUP, L.P.

Case Summary

On 04/17/2018 AHMED ELDEFRAWY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CIM GROUP, L P. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AHMED ELDEFRAWY

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Others

CIM GROUP, L.P.

FLEETWOOD ALUMINUM PRODUCTS, INC.

ACCI Corporation

Manarang Family Trust

American Multifamily, Inc.

Harbor Lofts Community Association

Stonekastle Community Management, Inc.

Daryl Manarang

Stonekastle Community Management

Lucky Glass, Inc.

American Contructors Inc.

Harbor Loft Community Association

Dolores Manarang

Yasmine E. Orabi

Protec Building Services

Yasmine Orabi

Protec Building Services, Inc.

Lucky's Glass

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Other Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF KAVEH KESHMIRI

Sellar Hazard & Lucia

MORROW & WHITE

Prindle, Goetz, Barnes & Reinholtz LLP

Law Office of Margaret Reyes

Hartsuyker, Stratman & Williams-Abrego

Bremer Whyte Brown & O'Meara, LLP

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Other Attorneys

Sellar Hazard & Lucia

MORROW & WHITE

Prindle, Goetz, Barnes & Reinholtz LLP

Law Office of Margaret Reyes

Hartsuyker, Stratman & Williams-Abrego

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY FLEETWOOD ALUMINUM PRODUCTS, INC. ON 06/28/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY FLEETWOOD ALUMINUM PRODUCTS, INC. ON 06/28/2019

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY HARBOR LOFTS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION; STONEKASTLE COMMUNITY MANAGEMENT, INC. ON 06/06/2019

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY HARBOR LOFTS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION; STONEKASTLE COMMUNITY MANAGEMENT, INC. ON 06/06/2019

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY FLEETWOOD ALUMINUM PRODUCTS, INC. ON 06/03/2019

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY FLEETWOOD ALUMINUM PRODUCTS, INC. ON 06/03/2019

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY FLEETWOOD ALUMINUM PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/16/2019

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY FLEETWOOD ALUMINUM PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/16/2019

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY HARBOR LOFTS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION; STONEKASTLE COMMUNITY MANAGEMENT, INC. ON 05/09/2019

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY HARBOR LOFTS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION; STONEKASTLE COMMUNITY MANAGEMENT, INC. ON 05/09/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY FLEETWOOD ALUMINUM PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/14/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY FLEETWOOD ALUMINUM PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/14/2019

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY FLEETWOOD ALUMINUM PRODUCTS, INC. ON 04/22/2019

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY FLEETWOOD ALUMINUM PRODUCTS, INC. ON 04/22/2019

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY HARBOR LOFT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION ON 05/06/2019

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY HARBOR LOFT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION ON 05/06/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12535603 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12359382.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12535603 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12359382.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PROTEC BUILDING SERVICES, INC. ON 04/04/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PROTEC BUILDING SERVICES, INC. ON 04/04/2019

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY PROTEC BUILDING SERVICES, INC. ON 04/04/2019

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY PROTEC BUILDING SERVICES, INC. ON 04/04/2019

NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY) FILED BY FLEETWOOD ALUMINUM PRODUCTS, INC. ON 04/03/2019

NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY) FILED BY FLEETWOOD ALUMINUM PRODUCTS, INC. ON 04/03/2019

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ACCI CORPORATION ON 04/03/2019

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ACCI CORPORATION ON 04/03/2019

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ACCI CORPORATION; ACCI CORPORATION ON 04/03/2019

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ACCI CORPORATION; ACCI CORPORATION ON 04/03/2019

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY FLEETWOOD ALUMINUM PRODUCTS, INC. ON 03/27/2019

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY FLEETWOOD ALUMINUM PRODUCTS, INC. ON 03/27/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12525713 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12349472.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12525713 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12349472.

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY HARBOR LOFTS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION ON 03/26/2019

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY HARBOR LOFTS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION ON 03/26/2019

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY STONEKASTLE COMMUNITY MANAGEMENT, INC.; HARBOR LOFTS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION ON 03/26/2019

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY STONEKASTLE COMMUNITY MANAGEMENT, INC.; HARBOR LOFTS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION ON 03/26/2019

137 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY FLEETWOOD ALUMINUM PRODUCTS, INC. ON 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1639120 RECEIVED ON 06/28/2019 02:02:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY HARBOR LOFTS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION; STONEKASTLE COMMUNITY MANAGEMENT, INC. ON 06/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2802672 RECEIVED ON 06/06/2019 02:21:49 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY FLEETWOOD ALUMINUM PRODUCTS, INC. ON 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3797955 RECEIVED ON 06/03/2019 12:05:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY FLEETWOOD ALUMINUM PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1624134 RECEIVED ON 05/16/2019 06:35:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY HARBOR LOFTS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION; STONEKASTLE COMMUNITY MANAGEMENT, INC. ON 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1621447 RECEIVED ON 05/09/2019 12:35:18 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
221 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12353486 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12177216.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY FLEETWOOD ALUMINUM PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2672759 RECEIVED ON 05/18/2018 02:52:44 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/17/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOWARD, THEODORE ON 04/17/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12333413 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12157143.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ELDEFRAWY, AHMED ON 04/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ELDEFRAWY, AHMED ON 04/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY ELDEFRAWY, AHMED ON 04/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1489893 RECEIVED ON 04/17/2018 02:55:38 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stonekastle Community Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ACCI INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INSURANCE COMPANY RISK RETENTION GROUP is a litigant