This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/23/2023 at 12:22:36 (UTC).

AHMAD ALI VS. SALIM CHAGAN

Case Summary

On 09/21/2022 AHMAD ALI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SALIM CHAGAN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ahmad Ali

Defendants

Prudential Financial, Inc.

Salim Chagan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of K Sean Singh & Associates

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 09/21/2022.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 09/21/2022.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/13/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/13/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALI, AHMAD ON 09/21/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALI, AHMAD ON 09/21/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALI, AHMAD ON 09/21/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALI, AHMAD ON 09/21/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY ALI, AHMAD ON 09/21/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY ALI, AHMAD ON 09/21/2022

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/27/2022

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/27/2022

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CASE REASSIGNED TO KIMBERLY KNILL EFFECTIVE 01/09/2023.

CASE REASSIGNED TO KIMBERLY KNILL EFFECTIVE 01/09/2023.

 

Docket Entries

03/13/2023

HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: KNILL; Department: C17

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE REASSIGNED TO C17 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 03/13/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO KIMBERLY KNILL EFFECTIVE 01/09/2023.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2022

DocketALI, AHMAD REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 09/27/2022.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2022
View Court Documents

DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/27/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/13/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2022

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31209777 RECEIVED ON 09/21/2022 02:27:45 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 09/21/2022.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022

DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 09/21/2022.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALI, AHMAD ON 09/21/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022

DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY ALI, AHMAD ON 09/21/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALI, AHMAD ON 09/21/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ALI, AHMAD ON 09/21/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less