This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/18/2023 at 03:43:37 (UTC).

A.F. V. DOE 1, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2022 A F filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DOE 1,. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A. F.

Defendants

St. Pius V Catholic Church

St. Pius V Catholic School

The Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Herman Law

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY F., A. ON 12/06/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY F., A. ON 12/06/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY F., A. ON 12/06/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY F., A. ON 12/06/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY F., A. ON 12/06/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY F., A. ON 12/06/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13149045 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12977142.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13149045 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12977142.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/11/2023 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N06 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/11/2023 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N06 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/30/2023

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/30/2023

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY F., A. ON 01/30/2023

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY F., A. ON 01/30/2023

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY F., A. ON 01/30/2023

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY F., A. ON 01/30/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13171951 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13000057.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13171951 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13000057.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY F., A. ON 01/30/2023

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY F., A. ON 01/30/2023

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 01/31/2023 01:59:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 01/31/2023 01:59:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 01/31/2023

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 01/31/2023

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY F., A. ON 02/02/2023

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY F., A. ON 02/02/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY F., A. ON 02/02/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY F., A. ON 02/02/2023

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SALTER; Department: N06

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY F., A. ON 02/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY F., A. ON 02/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11097034 RECEIVED ON 02/02/2023 03:36:44 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11095323 RECEIVED ON 01/30/2023 04:49:22 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 01/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 01/31/2023 01:59:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41441514 RECEIVED ON 01/30/2023 04:49:22 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEX PARTE SCHEDULED FOR 02/01/2023 AT 11:45:00 AM IN N06 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY F., A. ON 01/30/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY F., A. ON 01/30/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/30/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/11/2023 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N06 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13149045 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12977142.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41419533 RECEIVED ON 12/06/2022 01:50:54 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SALTER, GLENN ON 12/06/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY F., A. ON 12/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY F., A. ON 12/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY F., A. ON 12/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less