This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/28/2018 at 12:04:53 (UTC).

ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP VS. IONELA MANOLACHE

Case Summary

On 06/13/2017 ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against IONELA MANOLACHE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP

Defendants

CATALIN MATEI

IONELA MANOLACHE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID S. SCHONFELD, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP ON 08/02/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP ON 08/02/2017

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/02/2017.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/02/2017.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP ON 08/02/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP ON 08/02/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP ON 08/02/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP ON 08/02/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP ON 07/25/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP ON 07/25/2017

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3563462 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3563462 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12183734 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12007429.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12183734 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12007429.

WRIT (ISSUED 7-7-2017) RECEIVED ON 07/03/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED 7-7-2017) RECEIVED ON 07/03/2017.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED 7-7-2017) RECEIVED ON 07/03/2017.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED 7-7-2017) RECEIVED ON 07/03/2017.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED 7-7-2017) RECEIVED ON 07/03/2017.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED 7-7-2017) RECEIVED ON 07/03/2017.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP ON 07/03/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP ON 07/03/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP ON 07/03/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP ON 07/03/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP ON 07/03/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP ON 07/03/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (CLERK'S JUDGMENT) FILED BY ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP ON 07/03/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (CLERK'S JUDGMENT) FILED BY ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP ON 07/03/2017

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12170297 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11993997.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12170297 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11993997.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP ON 06/13/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP ON 06/13/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP ON 06/13/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP ON 06/13/2017

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP ON 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP ON 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/02/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP ON 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP ON 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1406743 RECEIVED ON 08/02/2017 02:20:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP ON 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3563462 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP ON 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP ON 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (CLERK'S JUDGMENT) FILED BY ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP ON 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3562725 RECEIVED ON 07/03/2017 09:37:17 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12170297 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11993997.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP ON 06/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP ON 06/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY ADVANCED GROUP 97-67, LP ON 06/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4737556 RECEIVED ON 06/13/2017 08:04:42 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less