This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:52:28 (UTC).

ADS MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC VS. STANDARD PACIFIC OF ORANGE COUNTY, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 ADS MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against STANDARD PACIFIC OF ORANGE COUNTY, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

ADS MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC

STANDARD PACIFIC OF ORANGE COUNTY, INC.

STANDARD PACIFIC CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOMASSIAN, THROCKMORTON & INOUYE LLP

Defendant Attorney

PLANTE LEBOVIC, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ADS MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC ON 02/02/2018

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ADS MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC ON 02/02/2018

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY STANDARD PACIFIC CORP; STANDARD PACIFIC OF ORANGE COUNTY, INC. ON 11/14/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY STANDARD PACIFIC CORP; STANDARD PACIFIC OF ORANGE COUNTY, INC. ON 11/14/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY ADS MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC ON 10/17/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY ADS MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC ON 10/17/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ADR REVIEW HEARING 11/17/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ADR REVIEW HEARING 11/17/2017 09:00:00 AM.

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY ADS MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC ON 01/08/2018

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY ADS MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC ON 01/08/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ADS MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC; STANDARD PACIFIC OF ORANGE COUNTY, INC. ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ADS MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC; STANDARD PACIFIC OF ORANGE COUNTY, INC. ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY STANDARD PACIFIC CORP; STANDARD PACIFIC OF ORANGE COUNTY, INC. ON 11/14/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY STANDARD PACIFIC CORP; STANDARD PACIFIC OF ORANGE COUNTY, INC. ON 11/14/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD 01/11/2018 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD 01/11/2018 01:30:00 PM.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/14/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/14/2016

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL RECEIVED ON 12/06/2017.

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL RECEIVED ON 12/06/2017.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/30/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/30/2016 09:00:00 AM.

COMPLAINT FILED BY ADS MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY ADS MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC ON 02/26/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/14/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/14/2016 09:00:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY STANDARD PACIFIC CORP; STANDARD PACIFIC OF ORANGE COUNTY, INC. ON 01/06/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY STANDARD PACIFIC CORP; STANDARD PACIFIC OF ORANGE COUNTY, INC. ON 01/06/2017

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY STANDARD PACIFIC CORP; STANDARD PACIFIC OF ORANGE COUNTY, INC. ON 01/11/2017

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY STANDARD PACIFIC CORP; STANDARD PACIFIC OF ORANGE COUNTY, INC. ON 01/11/2017

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GLASS, GEOFFREY ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GLASS, GEOFFREY ON 02/26/2016.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ADR REVIEW HEARING 01/12/2018 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ADR REVIEW HEARING 01/12/2018 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 02/01/2018 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 02/01/2018 01:30:00 PM.

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2018
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY ADS MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC ON 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ADS MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC ON 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2639831 RECEIVED ON 02/12/2018 02:16:42 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 02/01/2018 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • ADR REVIEW HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/15/2018 AT 01:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION. PLAINTIFF TO PAY FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD CONTINUED TO 02/15/2018 AT 01:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION. PLAINTIFF TO PAY FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • ADR REVIEW HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 02/15/2018 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD SCHEDULED FOR 02/15/2018 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
91 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2016
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER C.C.P. 170.6 AS TO THE HONORABLE GEOFFREY T. GLASS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • CASE REASSIGNED TO THEODORE HOWARD EFFECTIVE 03/14/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. GEOFFREY GLASS) FILED BY ADS MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC ON 03/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3386566 RECEIVED ON 03/01/2016 05:49:47 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GLASS, GEOFFREY ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928228 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752446.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ADS MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC; STANDARD PACIFIC OF ORANGE COUNTY, INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ADS MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC; STANDARD PACIFIC OF ORANGE COUNTY, INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY ADS MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509796 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 03:30:22 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.