This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/27/2021 at 06:44:21 (UTC).

ADRIENNE SEMWAL VS. BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY DIRECT CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 ADRIENNE SEMWAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY DIRECT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adrienne Semwal

Defendants

Ms. Jackson

Burlington Coat Factory of Texas, Inc.

Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Downtown LA Law Group

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT CHANGE

NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT CHANGE

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/16/2021 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/16/2021 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12873489 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12701182.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12873489 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12701182.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SEMWAL, ADRIENNE ON 04/14/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SEMWAL, ADRIENNE ON 04/14/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SEMWAL, ADRIENNE ON 04/14/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SEMWAL, ADRIENNE ON 04/14/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY SEMWAL, ADRIENNE ON 04/14/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY SEMWAL, ADRIENNE ON 04/14/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Department: C13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPARTMENT CHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/16/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/16/2021 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12873489 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12701182.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41181647 RECEIVED ON 04/14/2021 02:03:12 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MCCORMICK, MELISSA ON 04/14/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SEMWAL, ADRIENNE ON 04/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SEMWAL, ADRIENNE ON 04/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY SEMWAL, ADRIENNE ON 04/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ms Jackson is a litigant

Latest cases where BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF TEXAS INC. A FLORIDA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY DIRECT CORPORATION is a litigant