Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/10/2021 at 07:26:00 (UTC).

ADELAIDA LIZETTE LEVARIO VS. KEITH NOBLE BEYER

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 ADELAIDA LIZETTE LEVARIO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KEITH NOBLE BEYER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adelaida Lizette Levario

Defendants

Paige Beyer

E. & J. Gallo Winery

Keith Noble Beyer

Rony Estuardo Alay Hernandez

Loren Sangree

Sally Sangree

Gallo Wines

Gallo Sales Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carpenter, Zuckerman & Rowley, LLP

Defendant Attorney

Gates, Gonter, Guy, Proudfoot & Muench, LLP

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,020.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12875073 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12702803.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,020.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12875073 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12702803.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GALLO SALES COMPANY, INC.; E. & J. GALLO WINERY ON 04/07/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GALLO SALES COMPANY, INC.; E. & J. GALLO WINERY ON 04/07/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GALLO SALES COMPANY, INC.; E. & J. GALLO WINERY ON 04/07/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GALLO SALES COMPANY, INC.; E. & J. GALLO WINERY ON 04/07/2021

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY GALLO WINES; E. & J. GALLO WINERY ON 04/07/2021

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY GALLO WINES; E. & J. GALLO WINERY ON 04/07/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY LEVARIO, ADELAIDA LIZETTE ON 03/17/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY LEVARIO, ADELAIDA LIZETTE ON 03/17/2021

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/24/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/24/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY LEVARIO, ADELAIDA LIZETTE ON 03/16/2021

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY LEVARIO, ADELAIDA LIZETTE ON 03/16/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12850796 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12678475.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12850796 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12678475.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LEVARIO, ADELAIDA LIZETTE ON 02/25/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LEVARIO, ADELAIDA LIZETTE ON 02/25/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LEVARIO, ADELAIDA LIZETTE ON 02/25/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LEVARIO, ADELAIDA LIZETTE ON 02/25/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY LEVARIO, ADELAIDA LIZETTE ON 02/25/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY LEVARIO, ADELAIDA LIZETTE ON 02/25/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2023
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: HUNT; Department: C23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,020.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12875073 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12702803.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21004049 RECEIVED ON 04/07/2021 04:01:13 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GALLO SALES COMPANY, INC.; E. & J. GALLO WINERY ON 04/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GALLO SALES COMPANY, INC.; E. & J. GALLO WINERY ON 04/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY GALLO WINES; E. & J. GALLO WINERY ON 04/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1832674 RECEIVED ON 04/07/2021 04:01:16 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY LEVARIO, ADELAIDA LIZETTE ON 03/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41170112 RECEIVED ON 03/17/2021 03:01:04 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/24/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY LEVARIO, ADELAIDA LIZETTE ON 03/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3991757 RECEIVED ON 03/16/2021 05:22:15 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12850796 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12678475.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3984909 RECEIVED ON 02/25/2021 05:50:28 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 02/25/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LEVARIO, ADELAIDA LIZETTE ON 02/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LEVARIO, ADELAIDA LIZETTE ON 02/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY LEVARIO, ADELAIDA LIZETTE ON 02/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where E. & J. Gallo Winery is a litigant