This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:46:34 (UTC).

ADAM SAMUEL MOSES VS. MATTHEW CHISOLM

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 ADAM SAMUEL MOSES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MATTHEW CHISOLM. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADAM SAMUEL MOSES

Defendant

MATTHEW CHISOLM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MARK J. PEACOCK

Defendant Attorney

RICHARDSON, FAIR & COHEN

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MOSES, ADAM SAMUEL ON 05/17/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MOSES, ADAM SAMUEL ON 05/17/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY MOSES, ADAM SAMUEL ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY MOSES, ADAM SAMUEL ON 02/26/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CHISOLM, MATTHEW ON 07/05/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CHISOLM, MATTHEW ON 07/05/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MOSES, ADAM SAMUEL ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MOSES, ADAM SAMUEL ON 02/26/2016

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MOSES, ADAM SAMUEL ON 10/25/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MOSES, ADAM SAMUEL ON 10/25/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11993623 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11817738.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11993623 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11817738.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY MOSES, ADAM SAMUEL ON 09/12/2016

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY MOSES, ADAM SAMUEL ON 09/12/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MOSES, ADAM SAMUEL ON 06/22/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MOSES, ADAM SAMUEL ON 06/22/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11992751 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11816856.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11992751 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11816856.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CHISOLM, MATTHEW ON 07/01/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CHISOLM, MATTHEW ON 07/01/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/19/2016 11:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/19/2016 11:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/06/2016 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/06/2016 08:30:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928120 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752345.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928120 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752345.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MOSES, ADAM SAMUEL ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MOSES, ADAM SAMUEL ON 02/26/2016

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY CHISOLM, MATTHEW ON 07/05/2016

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY CHISOLM, MATTHEW ON 07/05/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/06/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/06/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CHAFFEE, DAVID ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CHAFFEE, DAVID ON 02/26/2016.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MOSES, ADAM SAMUEL ON 10/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4626007 RECEIVED ON 10/25/2016 03:27:56 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/19/2016 11:45:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 10/26/2016 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C-20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 10/26/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY MOSES, ADAM SAMUEL ON 09/12/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2492553 RECEIVED ON 09/12/2016 11:28:20 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3427660 RECEIVED ON 06/22/2016 03:17:45 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MOSES, ADAM SAMUEL ON 05/17/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3414716 RECEIVED ON 05/17/2016 01:03:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/06/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CHAFFEE, DAVID ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928120 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752345.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MOSES, ADAM SAMUEL ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MOSES, ADAM SAMUEL ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MOSES, ADAM SAMUEL ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385334 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 02:55:08 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.