This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/16/2023 at 09:47:51 (UTC).

ADAM FOSTER VS. FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES INC.

Case Summary

On 03/28/2022 ADAM FOSTER filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adam Foster

Defendants

Richard Blue

Frontier California Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Jerome A. Clay

Defendant Attorney

Littler Mendelson, P.C.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY FOSTER, ADAM ON 04/01/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY FOSTER, ADAM ON 04/01/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/29/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/29/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13026770 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12854751.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13026770 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12854751.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FOSTER, ADAM ON 03/28/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FOSTER, ADAM ON 03/28/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FOSTER, ADAM ON 03/28/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FOSTER, ADAM ON 03/28/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY FOSTER, ADAM ON 03/28/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY FOSTER, ADAM ON 03/28/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13049146 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12877162.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13049146 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12877162.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. ON 05/16/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. ON 05/16/2022

CASE REASSIGNED TO NICO DOURBETAS EFFECTIVE 05/20/2022.

CASE REASSIGNED TO NICO DOURBETAS EFFECTIVE 05/20/2022.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. ON 08/15/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. ON 08/15/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FOSTER, ADAM ON 08/22/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FOSTER, ADAM ON 08/22/2022

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/29/2022 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/29/2022 09:00:00 AM.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY FOSTER, ADAM ON 10/31/2022

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY FOSTER, ADAM ON 10/31/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY FOSTER, ADAM ON 10/31/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY FOSTER, ADAM ON 10/31/2022

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/21/2022 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/21/2022 09:00:00 AM.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Department: C25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/21/2022 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 08/21/2023 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31226299 RECEIVED ON 10/31/2022 02:36:37 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY FOSTER, ADAM ON 10/31/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY FOSTER, ADAM ON 10/31/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41404598 RECEIVED ON 10/31/2022 02:36:37 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/29/2022 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 11/21/2022 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/21/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO NICO DOURBETAS EFFECTIVE 05/20/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY FOSTER, ADAM ON 04/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31139077 RECEIVED ON 04/01/2022 08:54:31 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/29/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MOSS, ROBERT ON 03/28/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13026770 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12854751.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FOSTER, ADAM ON 03/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FOSTER, ADAM ON 03/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY FOSTER, ADAM ON 03/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1968512 RECEIVED ON 03/28/2022 06:38:06 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less