This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/08/2021 at 08:18:02 (UTC).

ACE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY VS. MCKESSON CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 ACE PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against MCKESSON CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

MCKESSON CORPORATION

LIBERTY SPECIAL MARKETS AGENCY

NORTH AMERICAN CAPACITY INSURANCE COMPANY

GREAT LAKES INSURANCE COMPANY SE

NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON, SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO. B0509B0WCN1500017

ASPEN INSURANCE UK LIMITED

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON, SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO. 509/DL554610

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON, SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO. B0509BOWCN1600450

ARGO RE LIMITED

AIU INSURANCE COMPANY

MARKEL AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

IRONSHORE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON, SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO. B0509BOWCN1700419

NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

GOLDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED

XL INSURANCE AMERICA, INC.

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON, SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO. B0509BOWCN1600451

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HOLWELL SHUSTER & GOLDBERG LLP

LONDON FISCHER LLP

Defendant Attorney

Covington & Burling LLP

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/21/2021 08:59:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/21/2021 08:59:00 AM.

STATEMENT - OTHER (IN RESPONSE TO MO) FILED BY ACE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 04/15/2021

STATEMENT - OTHER (IN RESPONSE TO MO) FILED BY ACE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 04/15/2021

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/12/2021 03:58:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/12/2021 03:58:00 PM.

CASE REASSIGNED TO KIRK NAKAMURA EFFECTIVE 01/04/2021.

CASE REASSIGNED TO KIRK NAKAMURA EFFECTIVE 01/04/2021.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12815598 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12642677.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12815598 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12642677.

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY MCKESSON CORPORATION ON 12/02/2020

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY MCKESSON CORPORATION ON 12/02/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ACE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/20/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ACE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/20/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ACE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/20/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ACE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/20/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ACE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/20/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ACE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/20/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ACE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/20/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ACE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/20/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ACE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/20/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ACE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/20/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ACE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/20/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ACE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/20/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ACE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/20/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ACE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/20/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ACE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/20/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ACE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/20/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ACE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/20/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ACE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/20/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ACE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/20/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ACE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/20/2020

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/28/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2021
View Court Documents

DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/21/2021 08:59:00 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/21/2021

DocketTHE CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE OMNIBUS CALENDAR.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/21/2021

DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO OMNI EFFECTIVE 12/02/2020.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2021

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41182342 RECEIVED ON 04/15/2021 04:59:12 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT - OTHER (IN RESPONSE TO MO) FILED BY ACE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 04/15/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2021
View Court Documents

DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/12/2021 03:58:00 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2021

DocketTHE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 05/21/2021 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT CX103.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2021

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/21/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX103 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
11/17/2020
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY ACE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/17/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2020

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41133747 RECEIVED ON 11/17/2020 05:09:38 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2020
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY ACE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/12/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2020

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41131984 RECEIVED ON 11/11/2020 02:04:04 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2020

DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER WILSON, PETER ON 11/02/2020.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2020
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12802528 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12629567.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ACE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/02/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ACE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/02/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ACE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/02/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2020

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41128941 RECEIVED ON 11/02/2020 10:20:41 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less