This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/06/2021 at 03:42:21 (UTC).

ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC. VS. PLUTOS SAMA HOLDINGS, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/28/2020 ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PLUTOS SAMA HOLDINGS, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

Accounting Principals, Inc.

Other and Defendant

Plutos Sama Holdings, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

Law Office of Gary A. Bemis APC

Other and Defendant Attorney

Levatolaw, LLP

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 11/12/2021 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 11/12/2021 09:00:00 AM.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC. ON 09/17/2021

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC. ON 09/17/2021

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC. ON 09/15/2021

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC. ON 09/15/2021

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS 09/13/2021 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS 09/13/2021 01:30:00 PM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12900878 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12728665.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12900878 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12728665.

MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC. ON 06/16/2021

MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC. ON 06/16/2021

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/01/2021 02:31:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/01/2021 02:31:00 PM.

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC. ON 02/17/2021

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC. ON 02/17/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC. ON 02/18/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC. ON 02/18/2021

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC. ON 01/28/2021

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC. ON 01/28/2021

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY PLUTOS SAMA HOLDINGS, INC. ON 12/01/2020

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY PLUTOS SAMA HOLDINGS, INC. ON 12/01/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12814376 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12641494.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12814376 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12641494.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY PLUTOS SAMA HOLDINGS, INC. ON 12/01/2020

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY PLUTOS SAMA HOLDINGS, INC. ON 12/01/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC. ON 09/29/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC. ON 09/29/2020

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/16/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/16/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 07/28/2020.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 07/28/2020.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12763122 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12589580.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12763122 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12589580.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: HOFFER; Department: C42

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 11/12/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41261570 RECEIVED ON 11/05/2021 06:37:28 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT RECEIVED ON 11/05/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC. ON 11/04/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41260701 RECEIVED ON 11/04/2021 02:19:39 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC. ON 09/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21066524 RECEIVED ON 09/17/2021 12:03:34 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC. ON 09/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1894436 RECEIVED ON 09/15/2021 02:41:59 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41137002 RECEIVED ON 12/01/2020 07:57:50 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC. ON 09/29/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3940987 RECEIVED ON 09/29/2020 03:29:47 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/16/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12763122 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12589580.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41101332 RECEIVED ON 07/28/2020 12:20:35 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 07/28/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC. ON 07/28/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC. ON 07/28/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC. ON 07/28/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less