This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2021 at 06:58:06 (UTC).

ACACIA AT CYPRESS VILLAGE NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION VS. LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 ACACIA AT CYPRESS VILLAGE NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACACIA AT CYPRESS VILLAGE NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION

Defendants

CALATLANTIC HOMES, INC.

LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

RYLAND HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

CALATLANTIC GROUP, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Berding & Weil LLP

Defendant Attorney

Lorber, Greenfield & Polito, LLP

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/22/2021 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/22/2021 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,305.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12915315 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12743194.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,305.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12915315 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12743194.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CALATLANTIC GROUP, INC.; LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; RYLAND HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ON 07/16/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CALATLANTIC GROUP, INC.; LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; RYLAND HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ON 07/16/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ACACIA AT CYPRESS VILLAGE NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION ON 06/10/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ACACIA AT CYPRESS VILLAGE NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION ON 06/10/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ACACIA AT CYPRESS VILLAGE NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION ON 06/10/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ACACIA AT CYPRESS VILLAGE NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION ON 06/10/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ACACIA AT CYPRESS VILLAGE NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION ON 06/10/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ACACIA AT CYPRESS VILLAGE NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION ON 06/10/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ACACIA AT CYPRESS VILLAGE NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION ON 06/02/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ACACIA AT CYPRESS VILLAGE NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION ON 06/02/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12892945 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12720744.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12892945 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12720744.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ACACIA AT CYPRESS VILLAGE NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION ON 05/28/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ACACIA AT CYPRESS VILLAGE NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION ON 05/28/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY ACACIA AT CYPRESS VILLAGE NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION ON 05/28/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY ACACIA AT CYPRESS VILLAGE NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION ON 05/28/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: HUNT; Department: C23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/22/2021 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,305.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12915315 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12743194.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31039766 RECEIVED ON 07/16/2021 02:59:51 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CALATLANTIC GROUP, INC.; LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; RYLAND HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ON 07/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ACACIA AT CYPRESS VILLAGE NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION ON 06/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1857558 RECEIVED ON 06/10/2021 03:56:21 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ACACIA AT CYPRESS VILLAGE NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION ON 06/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41203888 RECEIVED ON 06/10/2021 03:56:20 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ACACIA AT CYPRESS VILLAGE NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION ON 06/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31025898 RECEIVED ON 06/10/2021 03:56:18 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21025198 RECEIVED ON 06/02/2021 09:42:39 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ACACIA AT CYPRESS VILLAGE NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION ON 06/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12892945 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12720744.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21024086 RECEIVED ON 05/28/2021 10:54:38 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 05/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ACACIA AT CYPRESS VILLAGE NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION ON 05/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ACACIA AT CYPRESS VILLAGE NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION ON 05/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ryland Homes of California Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where CALATLANTIC GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant