This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:49:39 (UTC).

ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS CORP. VS. LEE GRANGER

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS CORP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LEE GRANGER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS CORP.

Defendants

LEES COASTLINE CLEAN

LEE GRANGER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE RESOLUTION LAW GROUP, APC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS CORP. ON 09/09/2016

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS CORP. ON 09/09/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928269 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752487.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928269 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752487.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/30/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/30/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS CORP. ON 03/02/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS CORP. ON 03/02/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS CORP. ON 12/02/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS CORP. ON 12/02/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4510809 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4510809 REJECTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS CORP. ON 03/16/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS CORP. ON 03/16/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS CORP. ON 03/16/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS CORP. ON 03/16/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS CORP. ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS CORP. ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS CORP. ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS CORP. ON 02/26/2016

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS CORP. ON 12/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3485574 RECEIVED ON 12/02/2016 10:30:21 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS CORP. ON 09/09/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3455749 RECEIVED ON 09/09/2016 03:26:25 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/30/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS CORP. ON 03/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS CORP. ON 03/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3391836 RECEIVED ON 03/16/2016 01:39:22 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS CORP. ON 03/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4511387 RECEIVED ON 03/02/2016 07:50:21 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4510809 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928269 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752487.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS CORP. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS CORP. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385473 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 05:06:11 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.