This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/29/2022 at 04:40:00 (UTC).

ABDERRAHMAN ALJAMAL VS. THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 ABDERRAHMAN ALJAMAL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Abderrahman Aljamal

Defendants

California Department of Transportation

The State of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kordab Law Offices

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/04/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N16 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/04/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N16 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13044804 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12872820.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13044804 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12872820.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALJAMAL, ABDERRAHMAN ON 05/05/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALJAMAL, ABDERRAHMAN ON 05/05/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALJAMAL, ABDERRAHMAN ON 05/05/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALJAMAL, ABDERRAHMAN ON 05/05/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY ALJAMAL, ABDERRAHMAN ON 05/05/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY ALJAMAL, ABDERRAHMAN ON 05/05/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ALJAMAL, ABDERRAHMAN ON 05/06/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ALJAMAL, ABDERRAHMAN ON 05/06/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1985553 RECEIVED ON 05/06/2022 11:59:14 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ALJAMAL, ABDERRAHMAN ON 05/06/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1984900 RECEIVED ON 05/05/2022 10:31:29 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ALJAMAL, ABDERRAHMAN ON 05/05/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALJAMAL, ABDERRAHMAN ON 05/05/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALJAMAL, ABDERRAHMAN ON 05/05/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13044804 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12872820.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GAFFNEY, DONALD ON 05/05/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/04/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N16 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant