This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/07/2022 at 02:44:59 (UTC).

AARON OGDEN VS JEANNNETTE OGDEN

Case Summary

On 05/25/2022 AARON OGDEN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JEANNNETTE OGDEN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3748

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ogden, Aaron

Respondent

OGDEN, JEANNNETTE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS 05/25/2022

SUMMONS 05/25/2022

DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 05/25/2022

DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 05/25/2022

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 05/25/2022

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 05/25/2022

RETURN SHEET - EXPEDITED JUDGMENT 08/11/2022

RETURN SHEET - EXPEDITED JUDGMENT 08/11/2022

WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 08/11/2022

WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 08/11/2022

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 08/11/2022 PDD

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 08/11/2022 PDD

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 08/11/2022 PDD

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 08/11/2022 PDD

DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 08/11/2022

DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 08/11/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 08/02/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 08/02/2022

REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 08/02/2022

REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 08/02/2022

JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 08/24/2022

JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 08/24/2022

NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 08/24/2022

NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 08/24/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 08/24/2022; Filing Party: OGDEN, AARON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 08/24/2022; Filing Party: OGDEN, AARON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketJUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 08/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 08/11/2022; Filing Party: OGDEN, AARON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 08/11/2022 PDD; Filing Party: OGDEN, AARON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 08/11/2022 PDD; Filing Party: OGDEN, JEANNNETTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 08/11/2022; Filing Party: OGDEN, AARON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN SHEET - EXPEDITED JUDGMENT 08/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 08/02/2022; Filing Party: OGDEN, AARON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 08/02/2022; Filing Party: OGDEN, AARON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketCONFIDENTIAL - PARTY ID - RELATED CASE - UPDATE PARTY 05/25/2022; Filing Party: OGDEN, AARON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS 05/25/2022; Filing Party: OGDEN, AARON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 05/25/2022; Filing Party: OGDEN, AARON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION - DISSOLUTION 05/25/2022; Filing Party: OGDEN, AARON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less