This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:47:25 (UTC).

A & A READY MIXED CONCRETE, INC. VS. KENNETH A. DEVER

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 A A READY MIXED CONCRETE, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KENNETH A DEVER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A & A READY MIXED CONCRETE, INC.

Defendant

KENNETH A. DEVER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEVIRIAN & SHINMOTO PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

CORRESPONDENCE RECEIVED ON 02/20/2018.

CORRESPONDENCE RECEIVED ON 02/20/2018.

MEMORANDUM FOR SETTING FOR HEARING FILED BY A & A READY MIXED CONCRETE, INC. ON 07/26/2016

MEMORANDUM FOR SETTING FOR HEARING FILED BY A & A READY MIXED CONCRETE, INC. ON 07/26/2016

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 09/22/2016) RECEIVED ON 09/22/2016.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 09/22/2016) RECEIVED ON 09/22/2016.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY A & A READY MIXED CONCRETE, INC. ON 05/13/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY A & A READY MIXED CONCRETE, INC. ON 05/13/2016

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 2/20/18) RECEIVED ON 02/20/2018.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 2/20/18) RECEIVED ON 02/20/2018.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY A & A READY MIXED CONCRETE, INC. ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY A & A READY MIXED CONCRETE, INC. ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY A & A READY MIXED CONCRETE, INC. ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY A & A READY MIXED CONCRETE, INC. ON 02/26/2016

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY A & A READY MIXED CONCRETE, INC. ON 07/26/2016

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY A & A READY MIXED CONCRETE, INC. ON 07/26/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY A & A READY MIXED CONCRETE, INC. ON 05/13/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY A & A READY MIXED CONCRETE, INC. ON 05/13/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928287 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752505.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928287 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752505.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12301541 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12125301.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12301541 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12125301.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY A & A READY MIXED CONCRETE, INC. ON 07/26/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY A & A READY MIXED CONCRETE, INC. ON 07/26/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY A & A READY MIXED CONCRETE, INC. ON 07/26/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY A & A READY MIXED CONCRETE, INC. ON 07/26/2016

JUDGMENT FILED BY A & A READY MIXED CONCRETE, INC. ON 08/10/2016

JUDGMENT FILED BY A & A READY MIXED CONCRETE, INC. ON 08/10/2016

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 07/26/2016.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 07/26/2016.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY A & A READY MIXED CONCRETE, INC. ON 07/26/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY A & A READY MIXED CONCRETE, INC. ON 07/26/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/30/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/30/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12301541 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12125301.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CORRESPONDENCE RECEIVED ON 02/20/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 2/20/18) RECEIVED ON 02/20/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2642000 RECEIVED ON 02/19/2018 03:01:17 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1468830 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12034090 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11858095.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 09/22/2016) RECEIVED ON 09/22/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3460555 RECEIVED ON 09/22/2016 03:46:35 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2495297 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3439166 RECEIVED ON 07/26/2016 01:26:52 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/30/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY A & A READY MIXED CONCRETE, INC. ON 05/13/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY A & A READY MIXED CONCRETE, INC. ON 05/13/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4547571 RECEIVED ON 05/13/2016 04:47:17 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928287 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752505.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY A & A READY MIXED CONCRETE, INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY A & A READY MIXED CONCRETE, INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY A & A READY MIXED CONCRETE, INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509933 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 05:56:13 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.