This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/16/2022 at 06:41:11 (UTC).

5 CORAL COVE WAY LLC VS. IRIE KASINGER

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 5 CORAL COVE WAY LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against IRIE KASINGER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

5 Coral Cove Way LLC

Defendants

Irie Kasinger

Old Republic Surety Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Freeman & Associates, A Law Corporation

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY 5 CORAL COVE WAY LLC ON 11/03/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY 5 CORAL COVE WAY LLC ON 11/03/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY 5 CORAL COVE WAY LLC ON 11/03/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY 5 CORAL COVE WAY LLC ON 11/03/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY 5 CORAL COVE WAY LLC ON 11/03/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY 5 CORAL COVE WAY LLC ON 11/03/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12966951 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12794874.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12966951 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12794874.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/06/2022 AT 02:00:00 PM IN N15 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/06/2022 AT 02:00:00 PM IN N15 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY 5 CORAL COVE WAY LLC ON 01/13/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY 5 CORAL COVE WAY LLC ON 01/13/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY 5 CORAL COVE WAY LLC ON 01/13/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY 5 CORAL COVE WAY LLC ON 01/13/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SLAUGHTER; Department: N15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY 5 CORAL COVE WAY LLC ON 01/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31107580 RECEIVED ON 01/13/2022 02:53:11 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY 5 CORAL COVE WAY LLC ON 01/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21110116 RECEIVED ON 01/13/2022 02:52:58 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/06/2022 AT 02:00:00 PM IN N15 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12966951 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12794874.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41260304 RECEIVED ON 11/03/2021 04:57:24 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SLAUGHTER, FRED ON 11/03/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY 5 CORAL COVE WAY LLC ON 11/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY 5 CORAL COVE WAY LLC ON 11/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY 5 CORAL COVE WAY LLC ON 11/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, INC. is a litigant