This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/15/2017 at 08:24:21 (UTC).

3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 1, LLC VS. AMERICAN RECOVERY RESIDENTIAL OP, LP

Case Summary

On 05/16/2014 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 1, LLC filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against AMERICAN RECOVERY RESIDENTIAL OP, LP. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Appellants

3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 14, LLC

3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 7, LLC

3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 1, LLC

3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 25, LLC

3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 30, LLC

3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 13, LLC

3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 36, LLC

3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 40, LLC

Defendants

TOM RINI

THE AMERICAN RECOVERY RESIDENTIAL TRUS

TODD A. MIKLES

AMERICAN RECOVERY RESIDENTIAL OP, LP

AMERICAN RECOVERY RESIDENTIAL ADVISORS

DAYMARK PROPERTIES REALTY, INC.

STEVEN KRIES

ETIENNE LOCOH

DAYMARK REALTY ADVISORS, INC.

AMERICAN RECOVERY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, GP, INC

ARRT RIVER EXCHANGE OWNER, LLC

SOVEREIGN STRATEGIC MORTGAGE FUND, LLC

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Appellant Attorney

CATANZARITE LAW CORPORATION

Defendant Attorneys

GORDON & HOLMES

ADAM T KENT

Other Attorneys

LESNICK PRINCE & PAPPAS LLP

 

Court Documents

REMITTITUR (G052006) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/01/2015

REMITTITUR (G052006) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/01/2015

ORDER G052006

ORDER G052006

NOTICE - OTHER (ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT) FILED BY 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 1, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 7, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 14, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 25, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 30, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 32, LLC; 3100 R

NOTICE - OTHER (ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT) FILED BY 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 1, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 7, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 14, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 25, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 30, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 32, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 36, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 37, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 40, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 13, LLC ON 11/06/2015

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 11/03/2015 11:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 11/03/2015 11:00:00 AM.

ORDER - OTHER (APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT) FILED BY 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 1, LLC ON 11/03/2015

ORDER - OTHER (APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT) FILED BY 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 1, LLC ON 11/03/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11870849 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11695046.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11870849 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11695046.

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 1, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 7, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 14, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 25, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 30, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 32, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 1, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 7, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 14, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 25, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 30, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 32, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 36, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 37, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 40, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 13, LLC ON 10/30/2015

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (FOR AN ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DISMISSING THE INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS OF THE NAMED PLAINTIFS WITH PREJUDICE) FILED BY 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 1, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 7, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 14, LLC; 3100 R

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (FOR AN ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DISMISSING THE INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS OF THE NAMED PLAINTIFS WITH PREJUDICE) FILED BY 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 1, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 7, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 14, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 25, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 30, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 32, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 36, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 37, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 40, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 13, LLC ON 10/30/2015

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/30/2015

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/30/2015

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2417068 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2417068 REJECTED.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 10/23/2015 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 10/23/2015 01:30:00 PM.

STIPULATION - OTHER (TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE, DEMURRERS AND MOTION TO STRIKE) FILED BY 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 1, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 7, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 14, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 25, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 30, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXC

STIPULATION - OTHER (TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE, DEMURRERS AND MOTION TO STRIKE) FILED BY 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 1, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 7, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 14, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 25, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 30, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 32, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 36, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 37, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 40, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 13, LLC ON 10/15/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11866631 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11690815.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11866631 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11690815.

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (FOR AN ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DISMISSING THE CASE WITH PREJUDICE...) FILED BY 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 1, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 7, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 14, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 25, LLC; 3100 RIVER

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (FOR AN ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DISMISSING THE CASE WITH PREJUDICE...) FILED BY 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 1, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 7, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 14, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 25, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 30, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 32, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 36, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 37, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 40, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 13, LLC ON 10/22/2015

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 1, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 7, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 14, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 25, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 30, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 32, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 1, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 7, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 14, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 25, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 30, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 32, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 36, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 37, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 40, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 13, LLC ON 10/22/2015

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/22/2015

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/22/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11864823 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11689007.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11864823 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11689007.

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE, DEMURRERS AND MOTION TO STRIKE) FILED BY 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 1, LLC ON 10/19/2015

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE, DEMURRERS AND MOTION TO STRIKE) FILED BY 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 1, LLC ON 10/19/2015

215 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2015
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR (G052006) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/01/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER G052006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER (ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT) FILED BY 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 1, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 7, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 14, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 25, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 30, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 32, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 36, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 37, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 40, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 13, LLC ON 11/06/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2420963 RECEIVED ON 11/06/2015 02:53:02 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 11/03/2015 11:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - OTHER (APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT) FILED BY 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 1, LLC ON 11/03/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4457845 RECEIVED ON 10/30/2015 10:52:46 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
391 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2014
  • THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 09/15/2014 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT CX105.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • THE COURT DEEMS THIS CASE EXCEPTIONAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/15/2014 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX105 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER PERK, STEVEN ON 05/16/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE), 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11598123 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11422168.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 1, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 7, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 14, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 25, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 30, LLC ON 05/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 1, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 7, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 14, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 25, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 30, LLC ON 05/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 1, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 7, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 14, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 25, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 30, LLC ON 05/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 1, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 7, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 14, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 25, LLC; 3100 RIVER EXCHANGE 30, LLC ON 05/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4191535 RECEIVED ON 05/16/2014 04:25:08 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAYMARK PROPERTIES REALTY INC is a litigant