This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 08:53:59 (UTC).

30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC VS. KALE L. WILLIS

Case Summary

On 07/25/2017 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KALE L WILLIS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC

Defendants

KALE L. WILLIS

TONI CAROLE WILLIS

NELSON KALANI WILLIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 10/31/2017

JUDGMENT FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 10/31/2017

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 10/26/2017.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 10/26/2017.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 10/26/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 10/26/2017

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 10/26/2017

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 10/26/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 10/26/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 10/26/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/17/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/17/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12197755 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12021471.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12197755 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12021471.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/02/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/02/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/02/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/02/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/02/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/02/2017

WRIT (ISSUED 08/03/2017) RECEIVED ON 08/02/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED 08/03/2017) RECEIVED ON 08/02/2017.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/02/2017

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/02/2017

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 08/03/2017) FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/02/2017

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 08/03/2017) FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/02/2017

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12192819 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12016519.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12192819 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12016519.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 07/25/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 07/25/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 07/25/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 07/25/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 07/25/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 07/25/2017

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 10/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 10/26/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 10/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 10/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 10/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1434768 RECEIVED ON 10/26/2017 01:56:05 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 08/03/2017) FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2578975 RECEIVED ON 08/02/2017 03:19:08 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12192819 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12016519.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY 30122 NIGUEL APARTMENTS, LLC ON 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2576189 RECEIVED ON 07/25/2017 02:29:43 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less