This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 06:44:24 (UTC).

2210 SANTA ANA OPCO, LLC VS. SINANIAN DEVELOPMENT, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/10/2020 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SINANIAN DEVELOPMENT, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

2210 Santa Ana OPCO, LLC

2210 E. First Street, LLC

2210 First Street, LLC

Defendants

INTEGRATED DEMOLITION AND REMEDIATION

Integrated Demolition and Remediation Incorporated

Sinanian Development, Inc.

Santa Ana Senior Associates, A California Limited Partnership

Integrated Demolition and Remediation, Inc.

Others and Defendants

Sinanian Development, Inc.

Santa Ana Senior Associates, A California Limited Partnership

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Gibbs Gidden Locher Turner Senet & Wittbrodt LLP

Other and Defendant Attorneys

Collins + Collins LLP

Goldberg Segalla LLP

Walsh McKean Furcolo LLP

Collins Collins Muir + Stewart LLP

 

Court Documents

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31084330 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31084330 REJECTED.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO, LLC; 2210 FIRST STREET, LLC ON 11/10/2021

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO, LLC; 2210 FIRST STREET, LLC ON 11/10/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12969157 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12797080.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12969157 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12797080.

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DEADLINES) FILED BY 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO, LLC; 2210 FIRST STREET, LLC ON 11/09/2021

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DEADLINES) FILED BY 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO, LLC; 2210 FIRST STREET, LLC ON 11/09/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/09/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/09/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/09/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/09/2021

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO, LLC; 2210 E. FIRST STREET, LLC ON 10/14/2021

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO, LLC; 2210 E. FIRST STREET, LLC ON 10/14/2021

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (ZOE 1) FILED BY SANTA ANA SENIOR ASSOCIATES, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 09/21/2021

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (ZOE 1) FILED BY SANTA ANA SENIOR ASSOCIATES, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 09/21/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12947356 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12775255.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12947356 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12775255.

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY 2210 E. FIRST STREET, LLC ON 09/21/2021

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY 2210 E. FIRST STREET, LLC ON 09/21/2021

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (ROE 1) FILED BY SINANIAN DEVELOPMENT, INC. ON 08/23/2021

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (ROE 1) FILED BY SINANIAN DEVELOPMENT, INC. ON 08/23/2021

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY SINANIAN DEVELOPMENT, INC. ON 04/23/2021

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY SINANIAN DEVELOPMENT, INC. ON 04/23/2021

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY SINANIAN DEVELOPMENT, INC. ON 03/25/2021

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY SINANIAN DEVELOPMENT, INC. ON 03/25/2021

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY SINANIAN DEVELOPMENT, INC. ON 03/25/2021

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY SINANIAN DEVELOPMENT, INC. ON 03/25/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12867076 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12694755.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12867076 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12694755.

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED PRE-TRIAL DATES) FILED BY SANTA ANA SENIOR ASSOCIATES, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 04/01/2021

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED PRE-TRIAL DATES) FILED BY SANTA ANA SENIOR ASSOCIATES, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 04/01/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/31/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/31/2021

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3958403 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3958403 REJECTED.

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: HOFFER; Department: C42

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • HearingDescription: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: HOFFER; Department: C42

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31084330 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO, LLC; 2210 FIRST STREET, LLC ON 11/10/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31085153 RECEIVED ON 11/10/2021 04:14:43 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/15/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/28/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12969157 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12797080.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21087124 RECEIVED ON 11/09/2021 11:38:02 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DEADLINES) FILED BY 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO, LLC; 2210 FIRST STREET, LLC ON 11/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
113 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1713638 RECEIVED ON 01/28/2020 02:19:42 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO, LLC ON 01/24/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO, LLC ON 01/24/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41058936 RECEIVED ON 01/24/2020 05:04:43 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12691522 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12516521.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41053554 RECEIVED ON 01/10/2020 01:46:46 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 01/10/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 01/10/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 01/10/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 01/10/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 2210 Santa Ana OPCO, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SINANIAN DEVELOPMENT INC is a litigant