This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/09/2021 at 07:00:53 (UTC).

20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. VS. USS CAL BUILDERS, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/26/2021 20/20 PLUMBING HEATING, INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against USS CAL BUILDERS, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

20/20 Plumbing & Heating, Inc.

Defendants

USS Cal Builders, Inc.

Fountain Valley Propco, LLC

Lancaster Pollard & Mortgage Co., LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward M. Picozzi

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/25/2021 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/25/2021 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12879304 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12707063.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12879304 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12707063.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. ON 04/26/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. ON 04/26/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. ON 04/26/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. ON 04/26/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: GASTELUM; Department: C11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/25/2021 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12879304 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12707063.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1839547 RECEIVED ON 04/25/2021 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 04/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. ON 04/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. ON 04/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where USS Cal Builders, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PICOZZI, EDWARD M