Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/21/2021 at 06:55:51 (UTC).

20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. VS. THE AUSTIN COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 20/20 PLUMBING HEATING, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE AUSTIN COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

20/20 Plumbing & Heating, Inc.

Defendants

S3 Hospitality LLC

The Austin Company

Deep Sea Hospitality LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward M. Picozzi Attorney at Law

 

Court Documents

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/17/2023 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/17/2023 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/17/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/17/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. ON 01/14/2021

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. ON 01/14/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12818476 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12645584.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12818476 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12645584.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. ON 12/09/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. ON 12/09/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. ON 12/09/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. ON 12/09/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2023
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: HOWARD; Department: C18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • HearingDescription: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: HOWARD; Department: C18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/17/2023 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/17/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. ON 01/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41149152 RECEIVED ON 01/14/2021 11:18:45 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOWARD, THEODORE ON 12/09/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12818476 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12645584.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. ON 12/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. ON 12/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2965007 RECEIVED ON 12/09/2020 12:00:08 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S3 Hospitality LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AUSTIN CO is a litigant

Latest cases where 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PICOZZI, EDWARD M