This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/20/2021 at 06:45:00 (UTC).

20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. VS. R.D. OLSON CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 20/20 PLUMBING HEATING, INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against R D OLSON CONSTRUCTION, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

20/20 Plumbing & Heating, Inc.

Defendants

City National Bank

Newport Beach Propco, LP

North American Speciality Insurance Company

R.D. Olson Construction, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward M. Picozzi

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. ON 07/08/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. ON 07/08/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. ON 07/08/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. ON 07/08/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. ON 07/08/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. ON 07/08/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12910515 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12738376.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12910515 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12738376.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/28/2021 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/28/2021 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. ON 07/20/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. ON 07/20/2021

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31040997 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31040997 REJECTED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. ON 08/16/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. ON 08/16/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21053751 RECEIVED ON 08/16/2021 10:03:10 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. ON 08/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31040997 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21043771 RECEIVED ON 07/20/2021 04:27:58 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. ON 07/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/28/2021 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12910515 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12738376.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41214329 RECEIVED ON 07/08/2021 01:26:18 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARKS, LINDA ON 07/08/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. ON 07/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. ON 07/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. ON 07/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where R.D. OLSON CONSTRUCTION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY NATIONAL BANK is a litigant