Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/09/2020 at 22:38:59 (UTC).

People vs Raylynn Leann Wineland

Case Summary

On 09/15/2014 People filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Raylynn Leann Wineland. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schechter, Jeanne, McNatt, Bobby W., Shaver, Donald, Kirihara, John, Moranda, David, Bacciarini, Mark, Jacobs, Harry, Baysinger, Robert F., Dougherty, Frank and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******407B

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schechter, Jeanne

McNatt, Bobby W.

Shaver, Donald

Kirihara, John

Moranda, David

Bacciarini, Mark

Jacobs, Harry

Baysinger, Robert F.

Dougherty, Frank

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Wineland, Raylynn Leann

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Drexel, Scott Gregory

Hegland, Caleb

Silveira, Nicole A.

Sandhaus, David

Saini, Monika

Tresidder, Joseph M.

Madayag, Kimberly

Compton, Misty

Serratto, Matthew Travers

Gates, Kathryn

Wall, Walter W.

McKinney, Ilia C.

Defendant Attorneys

Green, Anthony C

Hegland, Caleb D

Elgin, David

Samrao, Ramnik S

Andrade, Vincent

Meyer, Derek Scott

Pfeiff, Thomas M

Contract Public Defender

1 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Abstract of Judgment

10/07/2016: Abstract of Judgment

Notice

09/30/2016: Notice

Release Order

06/10/2016: Release Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

04/21/2016: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Affidavit of Probation Violation

04/06/2016: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Notice

04/05/2016: Notice

* Public *

03/30/2016: * Public *

Release Order

03/30/2016: Release Order

Minute Order - Printed copy with signature

03/30/2016: Minute Order - Printed copy with signature

Affidavit of Probation Violation

02/24/2016: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Affidavit of Probation Violation

11/02/2015: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Affidavit of Probation Violation

09/18/2015: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Affidavit

12/19/2014: Affidavit

Order

11/21/2014: Order

* Public *

11/21/2014: * Public *

Public Historical Documents

11/13/2014: Public Historical Documents

Information

10/31/2014: Information

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2016
  • DocketTranscript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DispositionAmended Prison; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273a(a): Abuse - Endanger Child With Possible GBI; Prison; Probation; Type: Drug Court/Deferred Judgment; Start Date: 03/30/2016; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 10/05/2016; Status; Status: Active; Date: 03/30/2016; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 06/17/2016; Status; Status: Terminated; Date: 10/05/2016; Adult Confinement; Type: Prison; Facility: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation; Start Date: 10/05/2016; Term Type: Middle; Term: 4 Years; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 177 Days; Conduct Credit: 176 Days; Comment: Count 1 PC273a(a); Condition - Adult; Fee Totals; $300.00; Fee Totals; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Charges; Charge Number: 005; PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); VOP Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Charges; Charge Number: 005; PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • FinancialWineland, Raylynn Leann; Transaction Assessment; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketTime Waived for Sentencing; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Wineland, Raylynn Leann; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Wineland, Raylynn Leann; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty

    Read MoreRead Less
116 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2014
  • DocketConverted Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • DocketArraignment; Original Type: Arraignment; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • DocketCouresty Notice - Adult Traffic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • ChargeCharges: Wineland, Raylynn Leann; Charge #: 002; Description: **PC273a(a): Abuse - Endanger Child With Possible GBI; Statute: 273a(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • ChargeCharges: Wineland, Raylynn Leann; Charge #: 002; Description: PC273a(a): Abuse - Endanger Child With Possible GBI; Statute: 273a(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • ChargeCharges: Wineland, Raylynn Leann; Charge #: 002; Description: PC273a(a): Abuse - Endanger Child With Possible GBI; Statute: 273a(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • ChargeCharges: Wineland, Raylynn Leann; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273a(a): Abuse - Endanger Child With Possible GBI; Statute: 273a(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • ChargeCharges: Wineland, Raylynn Leann; Charge #: 001; Description: **PC273a(a): Abuse - Endanger Child With Possible GBI; Statute: 273a(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • ChargeCharges: Wineland, Raylynn Leann; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273a(a): Abuse - Endanger Child With Possible GBI; Statute: 273a(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hegland, Caleb

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elgin, David

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samrao, Ramnik S