This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/23/2020 at 13:59:58 (UTC).

People vs. Melyssa Ariela Huerta

Case Summary

On 08/28/2012 People filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Melyssa Ariela Huerta. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schechter, Jeanne, McNatt, Bobby W., Shaver, Donald, Moranda, David, Bacciarini, Mark, Jacobs, Harry, Griffin, John E., Junior and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8470

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schechter, Jeanne

McNatt, Bobby W.

Shaver, Donald

Moranda, David

Bacciarini, Mark

Jacobs, Harry

Griffin, John E., Junior

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Huerta, Melyssa Ariela

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nored, Thane

McKean, Tyler

Taylor-Boreham, Anne Kathryn

Defendant Attorneys

Tran, Jennifer Le

Lyon, Paul J

Public Defender, Deputy

Lope, Armando

 

Court Documents

Complaint

08/28/2012: Complaint

Public Historical Documents

01/09/2015: Public Historical Documents

Request

08/31/2016: Request

Notice

09/09/2016: Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2017
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Charges; Charge Number: 001; HS11550(a): Use/Under Influence Of Controlled Substance; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 002; HS11364.1(a): Possess Controlled Substance Paraphernalia; Dism: Motion of the People

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Tran, Jennifer Le

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • DocketPC1538.5 Motion; Judicial Officer: McNatt, Bobby W.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Huerta, Melyssa Ariela; Deputy Public Defender: Lope, Armando; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: McKean, Tyler

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • DocketMotion; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Huerta, Melyssa Ariela; Deputy Public Defender: Lope, Armando; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Nored, Thane

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • FinancialHuerta, Melyssa Ariela; Transaction Assessment; $9.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued; Parties Present; Defendant: Huerta, Melyssa Ariela; Deputy Public Defender: Lope, Armando; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Taylor-Boreham, Anne Kathryn

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2014
  • DocketArraignment; Original Type: Arraignment; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Failed to Appear/Bench Warrant Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • DocketConverted Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2012
  • DocketConverted Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2012
  • DocketSuspend Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2012
  • DocketSuspend Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2012
  • DocketArraignment; Original Type: Arraignment; Judicial Officer: Griffin, John E., Junior; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Arrest Warrant Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • DocketCouresty Notice - Adult Traffic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2012
  • ChargeCharges: Huerta, Melyssa Ariela; Charge #: 002; Description: HS11364.1(a): Possess Controlled Substance Paraphernalia; Citation: 120331176; Statute: 11364.1(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2012
  • ChargeCharges: Huerta, Melyssa Ariela; Charge #: 001; Description: HS11550(a): Use/Under Influence Of Controlled Substance; Citation: 120331176; Statute: 11550(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tran, Jennifer Le

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lyon, Paul J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lope, Armando