This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/08/2020 at 21:49:38 (UTC).

People vs Krystal Casandra Trevino

Case Summary

On 07/30/2014 People filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Krystal Casandra Trevino. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Power, David E., McNatt, Bobby W., Shaver, Donald, Ash, Carol, Moranda, David, Papadakis, H. N., Dougherty, Frank and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4616

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Power, David E.

McNatt, Bobby W.

Shaver, Donald

Ash, Carol

Moranda, David

Papadakis, H. N.

Dougherty, Frank

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Trevino, Krystal Casandra

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hegland, Caleb D

Nored, Thane

McAfee, Michael

Hanson, Ann

Toscano, Jeremiah Joseph

Asdorian, Blake M

Silva, Michael

Defendant Attorneys

McMillan, Matthew Scott

Samrao, Ramnik S

Foster, Doug C

Merced County Public Defender

Freitas, Wade

Pfeiff, Thomas M

Andrade, Vincent

Boortz, Kimberly Ann

 

Court Documents

Public Historical Documents

11/01/2018: Public Historical Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

06/08/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

12/04/2017: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/04/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Declaration

12/01/2017: Declaration

Criminal: Minute Order

12/01/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/29/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Request

10/09/2015: Request

Proof of Service

10/09/2015: Proof of Service

Notice of Appeal (Appellate Division)

10/09/2015: Notice of Appeal (Appellate Division)

Motion

10/09/2015: Motion

Motion

09/18/2015: Motion

Motion

08/25/2015: Motion

* Public *

07/16/2015: * Public *

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketConfidential Historical Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPublic Historical Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Papadakis, H. N.; Charges; Charge Number: 001; HS11550(a): Use/Under Influence Of Controlled Substance; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 002; HS11364.1(a): Possess Controlled Substance Paraphernalia; Dism: Motion of the People

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Papadakis, H. N.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant; Contract Public Defender: Pfeiff, Thomas M; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Asdorian, Blake M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Trevino, Krystal Casandra; Contract Public Defender: Pfeiff, Thomas M; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Toscano, Jeremiah Joseph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Trevino, Krystal Casandra; Contract Public Defender: Pfeiff, Thomas M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant - Video; Judicial Officer: Dougherty, Frank; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Trevino, Krystal Casandra; Contract Public Defender: Foster, Doug C; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Hegland, Caleb D

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Trevino, Krystal Casandra

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • DocketRequest to Appear (With Fee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • DocketWarrant: Ordered; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • DocketConverted Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • DocketCouresty Notice - Adult Traffic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • ChargeCharges: Trevino, Krystal Casandra; Charge #: 002; Description: HS11364.1(a): Possess Controlled Substance Paraphernalia; Statute: 11364.1(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • ChargeCharges: Trevino, Krystal Casandra; Charge #: 001; Description: HS11550(a): Use/Under Influence Of Controlled Substance; Statute: 11550(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hanson, Ann

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McAfee, Michael

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Toscano, Jeremiah Joseph