This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/21/2020 at 16:19:08 (UTC).

People vs. JUAN VILLANUEVA

Case Summary

On 11/16/2007 People filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JUAN VILLANUEVA. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kirihara, John and Proietti, Donald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0666

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2007

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kirihara, John

Proietti, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Villanueva, Juan Olivares

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Merced County Public Defender

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/21/2012

FinancialVillanueva, Juan Olivares; R&R Adjustment; $1960.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/2010

DispositionSentence; Charges; Charge Number: 002; VC23578: BAC .15 or Higher (ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Sentence; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 01/08/2010; Term: 36 Months 0 Day; End Date: 01/08/2013; Status; Status: Active; Date: 01/08/2010

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/2010

DispositionAmended Sentence; Charges; Charge Number: 002; VC23152(b): Driving Under Influence Of Alcohol/Drugs; Sentence; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 01/08/2010; Term: 36 Months 0 Day; End Date: 01/08/2013; Status; Status: Active; Date: 01/08/2010

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/2010

DispositionSentence; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC23152(a): Driving Under Influence Of Alcohol/Drugs; Sentence; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 01/08/2010; Term: 36 Months 0 Day; End Date: 01/08/2013; Status; Status: Active; Date: 01/08/2010

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/2010

DispositionSentence; Charges; Charge Number: 002; VC23152(b): Driving Under Influence Of Alcohol/Drugs; Sentence; Converted Disposition; Fee: 1960.00; Adult Confinement; Type: Confinement; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 03/06/2010; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 5 Days; Comment: County Jail; Programs; DUI: 9 Month Class; Order Date: 01/08/2010; Comment: 9 Month DUI Treatment Program

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/2010

DispositionDisposition; Charges; Charge Number: 002; VC23578: BAC .15 or Higher (ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Admits

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/2010

DispositionDisposition; Charges; Charge Number: 002; VC23152(b): Driving Under Influence Of Alcohol/Drugs; Convicted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/2010

DispositionDisposition; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC23152(a): Driving Under Influence Of Alcohol/Drugs; Dism: No Reason Available

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/2010

FinancialVillanueva, Juan Olivares; Transaction Assessment; $1960.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/2010

DocketConverted Minute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
02/15/2008

DocketSuspend Status

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2008

DocketSuspend Status

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2008

DocketConversion

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2008

DispositionPlea; Charges; Charge Number: 002; VC23578: BAC .15 or Higher (ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Not Guilty

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2008

DispositionPlea; Charges; Charge Number: 002; VC23152(b): Driving Under Influence Of Alcohol/Drugs; Not Guilty

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2008

DispositionPlea; Charges; Charge Number: 001; Not in Statute Table; Not Guilty

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2007

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/10/2007

ChargeCharges: Villanueva, Juan Olivares; Charge #: 002; Description: VC23578: BAC .15 or Higher (ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/10/2007

ChargeCharges: Villanueva, Juan Olivares; Charge #: 002; Description: VC23152(b): Driving Under Influence Of Alcohol/Drugs; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/10/2007

ChargeCharges: Villanueva, Juan Olivares; Charge #: 001; Description: VC23152(a): Driving Under Influence Of Alcohol/Drugs; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

[+] Read More [-] Read Less