Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/04/2020 at 15:34:21 (UTC).

People vs. Dianne Jennifer Falasco

Case Summary

On 01/13/2014 People filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Dianne Jennifer Falasco. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Shaver, Donald, Ash, Carol, Bacciarini, Mark, Hansen, Ronald, Dougherty, Frank and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1578

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Shaver, Donald

Ash, Carol

Bacciarini, Mark

Hansen, Ronald

Dougherty, Frank

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Falasco, Dianne Jennifer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nored, Thane

Colacito, Anthony Michael

Madayag, Kimberly

Compton, Misty

Serratto, Matthew Travers

Oppliger, Trevor Z

Defendant Attorneys

McKechnie, C Logan

Alonso, George L

Falasco, Dominic

Loethen, Christopher

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

02/24/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/10/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Notice

02/07/2020: Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

02/03/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/29/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/24/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Notice

05/29/2019: Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

12/18/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/24/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

05/02/2018: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Memorandum

04/19/2018: Memorandum

Notice

02/20/2018: Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

02/20/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/17/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

01/11/2018: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Notice

08/27/2015: Notice

Notice

02/09/2015: Notice

Order

11/20/2014: Order

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketReport Credit/Fines; Original Type: Report Credit/Fines; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProgram Status; Original Type: Program Status; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant; Retained: Falasco, Dominic; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketReport Credit/Fines; Original Type: Report Credit/Fines; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProgram Status; Original Type: Program Status; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant; Retained: Loethen, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Proceedings; Original Type: Further Proceedings; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Falasco, Dianne Jennifer; Retained: Falasco, Dominic; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Proceedings; Original Type: Further Proceedings; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Falasco, Dianne Jennifer; Retained: Falasco, Dominic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DispositionAmended Probation; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC23153(b): DUI .08 Alcohol With Bodily Injury; Probation; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 10/01/2014; Term: 5 Years 0 Day; End Date: 10/01/2020; Status; Status: Active; Date: 10/01/2014; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 03/29/2018; Status; Status: Extended; Date: 03/29/2018; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 04/20/2018; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 05/03/2018; Status; Status: Reinstated; Date: 10/23/2019; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 01/24/2020; Status; Status: Reinstated; Date: 02/10/2020; Programs; Residential Treatment Program to be determined; Ordered; Party: Falasco, Dianne Jennifer; Order Date: 01/24/2020; Duration: 3 Months; Comment: Windward Way Recovery in Costa Mesa, CA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 024; PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); VOP Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
213 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2014
  • DocketConverted Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • DocketTime Waived: 10-Day/60-Day Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • DocketFingerprint Card

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • DocketSubpoenaed: Record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • DocketArraignment; Original Type: Arraignment; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Not Guilty Plea Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • DocketMotion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • DocketWarrant: Issued; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • DocketSuspend Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Falasco, Dominic

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Loethen, Christopher Paul