This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/07/2020 at 23:42:47 (UTC).

People vs Benjamin Placencia Gonzalez

Case Summary

On 03/15/2005 People filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Benjamin Placencia Gonzalez. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mewhinney, Douglas V., Moranda, David, Bissig, Louis F., Schechter, Jeanne, Garcia, Marc, Vanderwall, David G., McNatt, Bobby W., Shaver, Donald, Kirihara, John, Ash, Carol, Lacy, Edward M., Bacciarini, Mark, Jacobs, Harry, Slocum, Steven, Papadakis, H. N. and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0408

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2005

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mewhinney, Douglas V.

Moranda, David

Bissig, Louis F.

Schechter, Jeanne

Garcia, Marc

Vanderwall, David G.

McNatt, Bobby W.

Shaver, Donald

Kirihara, John

Ash, Carol

Lacy, Edward M.

Bacciarini, Mark

Jacobs, Harry

Slocum, Steven

Papadakis, H. N.

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendants

Gonzalez, Benjamin Placencia

Gonzalez, Jesus

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

McConney, Adam D

Compton, Misty

Serratto, Matthew Travers

Gates, Kathryn

Wall, Walter W.

McKinney, Ilia C.

Tresidder, Joseph M.

Defendant Attorneys

Hegland, Caleb D

Meyer, Derek Scott

Lyon, Paul J

Reed, Katharine

Elgin, David

Andrade, Vincent

Green, Anthony C

Berger, Richard

 

Court Documents

Order

10/18/2019: Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/18/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/18/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/13/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/09/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Petition

04/18/2019: Petition

Order

12/14/2018: Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/13/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Order

12/04/2018: Order

Declaration

12/04/2018: Declaration

Criminal: Minute Order

10/26/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Amended Criminal: Minute dated 9/14/18

09/14/2018: Amended Criminal: Minute dated 9/14/18

Criminal: Minute Order

09/14/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Amended Criminal: Minute Order 7/27/18

07/27/2018: Amended Criminal: Minute Order 7/27/18

Criminal: Minute Order

07/27/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Response

06/22/2018: Response

Criminal: Minute Order

06/21/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Request

06/19/2018: Request

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing: Video Conference; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Gonzalez, Benjamin Placencia; Deputy Public Defender: Reed, Katharine; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketHearing: Video Conference; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketHearing: Video Conference; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Reed, Katharine; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketSubpoenaed: Record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition

    Read MoreRead Less
133 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2006
  • DispositionSentence; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Sentence; Adult Confinement; Type: Confinement; Facility: California State Prison Other; Start Date: 11/13/2006; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 4 Years; Comment: State Prison - Lower Term

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2006
  • DispositionDisposition; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2006
  • DispositionDisposition; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC1170.12(c)(1)(a): With 1 or more prior Serious and/or Violent Felony Conviction; Convicted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2006
  • DispositionDisposition; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Convicted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2006
  • DocketTransmit Reporter Transcript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2005
  • DocketSubpoenaed: Record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2005
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2005
  • ChargeCharges: Gonzalez, Benjamin Placencia; Charge #: 001; Description: PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 667.5(b); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2005
  • ChargeCharges: Gonzalez, Benjamin Placencia; Charge #: 001; Description: PC1170.12(c)(1)(a): With 1 or more prior Serious and/or Violent Felony Conviction; Statute: 1170.12(c)(1)(a); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2005
  • ChargeCharges: Gonzalez, Benjamin Placencia; Charge #: 001; Description: PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Statute: 245(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McConney, Adam D

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tresidder, Joseph M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McKinney, Ilia C.