This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/18/2022 at 15:02:09 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Thomas Rudy Garcia

Case Summary

On 03/11/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Thomas Rudy Garcia. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lo, Paul and Moranda, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1364

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lo, Paul

Moranda, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Garcia, Thomas Rudy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Egan, Gerad Denis

Colacito, Anthony Michael

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Green, Anthony Charles

Loethen, Christopher Paul

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

03/11/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

03/11/2022: Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

Complaint

03/11/2022: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

03/16/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colacito, Anthony Michael; Defendant: Garcia, Thomas Rudy; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony Charles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Denied; Charge Number: 001; PC12022.1: Fel/While On Bail Or Recog; Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant: Garcia, Thomas Rudy; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Garcia, Thomas Rudy; Charge #: 001; Description: PC12022.1: Fel/While On Bail Or Recog; Statute: 12022.1; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Garcia, Thomas Rudy; Charge #: 001; Description: PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Statute: 667(b)-(i); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Garcia, Thomas Rudy; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Statute: 273.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Loethen, Christopher Paul

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Green, Anthony Charles

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent