This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/21/2020 at 17:22:25 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Tamisha Pounds

Case Summary

On 06/07/2012 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Tamisha Pounds. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Baysinger, Robert F., McCabe, Brian, Soper, Elva R., Breen, Thomas P., Jacobs, Harry, Griffin, John E., Junior, Rodriguez, Armando O. and Dougherty, Frank. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7931

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Los Banos Division

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Baysinger, Robert F.

McCabe, Brian

Soper, Elva R.

Breen, Thomas P.

Jacobs, Harry

Griffin, John E., Junior

Rodriguez, Armando O.

Dougherty, Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Pounds, Tamisha Akia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Drexel, Scott Gregory

Defendant Attorneys

Boortz, Kimberly Ann

Public Defender, Deputy

 

Court Documents

Report

05/29/2015: Report

Report

05/15/2015: Report

Waiver

05/13/2015: Waiver

Order

05/13/2015: Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

05/07/2015: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Public Historical Documents

05/07/2015: Public Historical Documents

Complaint

06/07/2012: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2015
  • DispositionAmended Commitment; Charges; Charge Number: 001; HS11377(a): Possession Of A Controlled Substance; Commitment; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 06/20/2012; Term: 36 Months 0 Day; End Date: 06/20/2015; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 05/08/2015; Comment: VOP #5 Denied; Status; Status: Terminated; Date: 05/29/2015; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 05/29/2015; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 232 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 116 Days; Conduct Credit: 116 Days; Comment: Count 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketTime Waived for Sentencing; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketCustody Status; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReport

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketResentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Pounds, Tamisha Akia; Deputy Public Defender: Boortz, Kimberly Ann; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Drexel, Scott Gregory

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReport

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • DocketReferred to Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • DocketCustody Status; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
156 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2012
  • DispositionPlea; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • DispositionPlea; Charges; Charge Number: 001; HS11377(a): Possession Of A Controlled Substance; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • DocketConverted Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • DocketNot Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • DocketDocument: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • DocketArraignment; Original Type: Arraignment; Judicial Officer: Dougherty, Frank; Hearing Time: 01:15 PM; Result: Not Guilty Plea Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2012
  • ChargeCharges: Pounds, Tamisha Akia; Charge #: 002; Description: HS11364.1(a): Possess Controlled Substance Paraphernalia; Statute: 11364.1(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2012
  • ChargeCharges: Pounds, Tamisha Akia; Charge #: 001; Description: PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 667.5(b); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2012
  • ChargeCharges: Pounds, Tamisha Akia; Charge #: 001; Description: HS11377(a): Possession Of A Controlled Substance; Statute: 11377(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Boortz, Kimberly Ann