This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/10/2020 at 01:23:34 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Tabrina Paredez

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Tabrina Paredez. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David, Breen, Thomas P., Bacciarini, Mark and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4206

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Breen, Thomas P.

Bacciarini, Mark

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Paredez, Tabrina Lynnette

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bakich, Donna

Turner, Leslie Allan

Defendant Attorneys

McMillan, Matthew Scott

Howard, Sean

Lope, Armando

Berger, Richard

 

Court Documents

Complaint

08/09/2018: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

08/10/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/15/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Fingerprint Card

08/15/2018: Fingerprint Card

Criminal: Minute Order

08/22/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/12/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/03/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Request

10/04/2018: Request

Criminal: Minute Order

10/05/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

04/27/2019: Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFTP - 20 Day Collection Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing: Other; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Bakich, Donna; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Berger, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • FinancialParedez, Tabrina Lynnette; Transaction Assessment; $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • FinancialParedez, Tabrina Lynnette; Transaction Assessment; $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketPayment Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketMonthly Payment Plan Setup - $45 Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DispositionProbation; Charges; Charge Number: 002; PC594(a): Vandalism; Probation; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 10/03/2018; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 10/02/2021; Status; Status: Active; Date: 10/03/2018; Fee Totals; $220.00; Fee Totals; $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 002; PC594(a): Vandalism; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC422(a): Criminal Threats; Dism: Motion of the People

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Bakich, Donna; Defendant: Paredez, Tabrina Lynnette; Deputy Public Defender: Howard, Sean

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketBail Review; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC422(a): Criminal Threats; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC594(a): Vandalism; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 003; PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Turner, Leslie Allan; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Lope, Armando

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Charges; Charge Number: 003; PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Arrest Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Paredez, Tabrina Lynnette; Charge #: 003; Description: PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Statute: 245(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Paredez, Tabrina Lynnette; Charge #: 002; Description: PC594(a): Vandalism; Statute: 594(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Paredez, Tabrina Lynnette; Charge #: 001; Description: PC422(a): Criminal Threats; Statute: 422(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Turner, Leslie Allan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bakich, Donna