This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/18/2022 at 17:03:15 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Shonte Bernabe

Case Summary

On 02/15/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Shonte Bernabe. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Moranda, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0888

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Moranda, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Bernabe, Shonte Marie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Her, Lee

Defendant Attorney

Page, Kathleen Coleen

 

Court Documents

Complaint

02/15/2022: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

03/07/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC14601.5(a): Driving w/Suspended or Revoked; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Her, Lee; Defendant: Bernabe, Shonte Marie; Deputy Public Defender: Page, Kathleen Coleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Bernabe, Shonte Marie; Charge #: 001; Description: VC14601.5(a): Driving w/Suspended or Revoked; Statute: 14601.5(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Page, Kathleen Coleen