This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/10/2022 at 16:01:49 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Shane J Carston

Case Summary

On 02/24/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Shane J Carston. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1027

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Carston, Shane J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Colacito, Anthony Michael

Defendant Attorneys

Moua, Chong

Page, Kathleen Coleen

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

02/24/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

02/24/2022: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

03/02/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colacito, Anthony Michael; Defendant: Carston, Shane J; Deputy Public Defender: Page, Kathleen Coleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC422(a): Criminal Threats; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC594(a): Vandalism; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Carston, Shane J; Deputy Public Defender: Moua, Chong

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Carston, Shane J; Charge #: 002; Description: PC594(a): Vandalism; Statute: 594(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Carston, Shane J; Charge #: 001; Description: PC422(a): Criminal Threats; Statute: 422(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moua, Chong

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Page, Kathleen Coleen