This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/10/2020 at 01:22:28 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Roy Renteria

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Roy Renteria. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Moranda, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4213

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Los Banos Division

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Moranda, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Renteria, Roy Alex

 

Court Documents

Revised FTA Courtesy Notice

09/11/2018: Revised FTA Courtesy Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

09/05/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

08/09/2018: CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFTA - 10 Day Collection Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Citation; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • FinancialRenteria, Roy Alex; Transaction Assessment; $485.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourtesy Notice - Notice to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Renteria, Roy Alex; Charge #: 001; Description: GUMC7-7-182(b)(8): Begging and Soliciting Within 15 Feet of the Entrance or Exit of a Building; Citation: 26535; Statute: 7-7-182(b)(8); Level: Infraction

    Read MoreRead Less