This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 11/09/2021 at 18:02:03 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Ronald Dhabolt, Junior

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Ronald Dhabolt, Junior. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David, Lo, Paul and Kirihara, John. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4349

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Lo, Paul

Kirihara, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Dhabolt, Ronald Stephen, Junior

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Margain, Andre Carlos

Colby, Travis

Colacito, Anthony Michael

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Berger, Richard

Noguera, Michael Anthony

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

09/10/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

09/10/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

09/17/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/01/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Collection Statement

10/18/2021: Collection Statement

Criminal: Minute Order

10/29/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketProhibited Person Relinquishment Form Findings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirearms Relinquishment Hearing; Original Type: Firearms Relinquishment Hearing; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Berger, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • FinancialDhabolt, Ronald Stephen, Junior; Transaction Assessment; $710.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Collections Statement Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketTranscript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DispositionProbation with Program; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273A(a): Child Abuse; Probation with Program; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 10/01/2021; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 90 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 24 Days; Conduct Credit: 24 Days; Comment: Count 1, Felony.; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 10/01/2021; Term: 4 Years; End Date: 09/30/2025; Status; Status: Active; Date: 10/01/2021; Programs; 52 Week Parenting Class; Ordered; Party: Dhabolt, Ronald Stephen, Junior; Order Date: 10/01/2021; Enroll by Date: 12/01/2021; Fee Totals; $40.00; $30.00; Fee Totals; $70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273A(a): Child Abuse; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273A(a): Child Abuse; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCharges and Direct Consequence of Plea

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketTime Waived for Sentencing; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colacito, Anthony Michael; Defendant: Dhabolt, Ronald Stephen, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Noguera, Michael Anthony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colacito, Anthony Michael; Defendant: Dhabolt, Ronald Stephen, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Noguera, Michael Anthony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273A(a): Child Abuse; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Dhabolt, Ronald Stephen, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Dhabolt, Ronald Stephen, Junior; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273A(a): Child Abuse; Statute: 273A(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noguera, Michael Anthony

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Berger, Richard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent