This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/16/2022 at 18:02:07 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Pedro Cendejas

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Pedro Cendejas. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kirihara, John, Moranda, David, Lo, Paul and Ash, Carol. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0233

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kirihara, John

Moranda, David

Lo, Paul

Ash, Carol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Cendejas, Pedro

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Navarro, Chris Reyes

Min, Thomas Keynes

Colacito, Anthony Michael

Defendant Attorneys

Berger, Richard

Lindemann, Callie Lee

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

01/12/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

01/12/2022: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

01/19/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/04/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/09/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/16/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Information

02/18/2022: Information

Criminal: Minute Order

03/02/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketReadiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; **PC69: Obstruct/Resist Executive Officer; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; **PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Denied; Charge Number: 002; **PC148(a)(1): Obstruct/Resist Public Officer; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Information; Original Type: Arraignment: Information; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colacito, Anthony Michael; Defendant: Cendejas, Pedro; Contract Public Defender: Lindemann, Callie Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketTranscript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC69: Obstruct/Resist Executive Officer; Held to Answer; Charge Number: 001; PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Held to Answer; Charge Number: 002; PC148(a)(1): Obstruct/Resist Public Officer; Held to Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Original Type: Preliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Navarro, Chris Reyes; Defendant: Cendejas, Pedro; Contract Public Defender: Lindemann, Callie Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colacito, Anthony Michael; Defendant: Cendejas, Pedro; Contract Public Defender: Lindemann, Callie Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colacito, Anthony Michael; Defendant: Cendejas, Pedro; Contract Public Defender: Lindemann, Callie Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC69: Obstruct/Resist Executive Officer; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Denied; Charge Number: 002; PC148(a)(1): Obstruct/Resist Public Officer; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Cendejas, Pedro; Contract Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Cendejas, Pedro; Charge #: 002; Description: PC148(a)(1): Obstruct/Resist Public Officer; Statute: 148(a)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Cendejas, Pedro; Charge #: 002; Description: **PC148(a)(1): Obstruct/Resist Public Officer; Statute: 148(a)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Cendejas, Pedro; Charge #: 001; Description: **PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Statute: 667(b)-(i); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Cendejas, Pedro; Charge #: 001; Description: PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Statute: 667(b)-(i); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Cendejas, Pedro; Charge #: 001; Description: **PC69: Obstruct/Resist Executive Officer; Statute: 69; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Cendejas, Pedro; Charge #: 001; Description: PC69: Obstruct/Resist Executive Officer; Statute: 69; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lindemann, Callie Lee

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Berger, Richard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent