This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/10/2020 at 19:05:26 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Patrick Hernandez

Case Summary

On 10/20/2014 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Patrick Hernandez. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Breen, Thomas P., Bissig, Louis F., Jacobs, Harry and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******666A

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Breen, Thomas P.

Bissig, Louis F.

Jacobs, Harry

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Hernandez, Patrick Edward

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

McKean, Tyler

Compton, Misty

McAfee, Michael

McConney, Adam D

Creeger, Matthew L

Nored, Thane

Defendant Attorneys

Pfeiff, Thomas M

Contract Public Defender

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/20/2014: Complaint

Returned Mail

12/12/2014: Returned Mail

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2016
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Bissig, Louis F.; Charges; Charge Number: 001; HS11364.1(a)(1): Possession of Smoking Device; Dism: Motion of the People

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Bissig, Louis F.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: McAfee, Michael; Defendant; Contract Public Defender: Pfeiff, Thomas M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: McKean, Tyler; Defendant: Hernandez, Patrick Edward

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Hernandez, Patrick Edward; Contract Public Defender: Pfeiff, Thomas M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Nored, Thane; Defendant: Hernandez, Patrick Edward

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: McConney, Adam D; Defendant: Hernandez, Patrick Edward; Contract Public Defender: Pfeiff, Thomas M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • DocketCustody Status; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • DocketGeneral Time Waived; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Creeger, Matthew L; Defendant: Hernandez, Patrick Edward; Contract Public Defender: Pfeiff, Thomas M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • DocketCustody Status; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2015
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • DocketReturn on Bench Warrant; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • DocketCitation: Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • DocketWarrant: Ordered; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • ChargeCharges: Hernandez, Patrick Edward; Charge #: 001; Description: HS11364.1(a)(1): Possession of Smoking Device; Statute: HS113364.1(a)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McConney, Adam D

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McAfee, Michael

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McKean, Tyler