This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 12/12/2021 at 18:04:37 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Nolan LaBelle

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Nolan LaBelle. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lo, Paul, Moranda, David, Breen, Thomas P. and Kirihara, John. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4998

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lo, Paul

Moranda, David

Breen, Thomas P.

Kirihara, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

LaBelle, Nolan Randall

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Colby, Travis

Colacito, Anthony Michael

McReynolds, Stacey Alyn

Defendant Attorneys

Moua, Chong

Green, Anthony Charles

Noguera, Michael Anthony

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

10/13/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

10/13/2021: Complaint

Bail Review Report

10/15/2021: Bail Review Report

Criminal: Minute Order

10/20/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/22/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/27/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/03/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colacito, Anthony Michael; Defendant: LaBelle, Nolan Randall; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony Charles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony Charles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Breen, Thomas P.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Noguera, Michael Anthony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant: LaBelle, Nolan Randall; Deputy Public Defender: Noguera, Michael Anthony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC451(c): Arson: Structure/Forest Land; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; PC451.1(a): Arson with aggravating factors; Denied; Charge Number: 001; PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Denied; Charge Number: 001; PC667(a)(1): Prior Serious Felony (ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Denied; Charge Number: 001; PC667(a)(1): Prior Serious Felony (ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: McReynolds, Stacey Alyn; Defendant: LaBelle, Nolan Randall; Deputy Public Defender: Moua, Chong

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • ChargeCharges: LaBelle, Nolan Randall; Charge #: 001; Description: PC667(a)(1): Prior Serious Felony (ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Statute: 667(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • ChargeCharges: LaBelle, Nolan Randall; Charge #: 001; Description: PC667(a)(1): Prior Serious Felony (ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Statute: 667(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • ChargeCharges: LaBelle, Nolan Randall; Charge #: 001; Description: PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Statute: 667(b)-(i); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • ChargeCharges: LaBelle, Nolan Randall; Charge #: 001; Description: PC451.1(a): Arson with aggravating factors; Statute: 451.1(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • ChargeCharges: LaBelle, Nolan Randall; Charge #: 001; Description: PC451(c): Arson: Structure/Forest Land; Statute: 451(c); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moua, Chong

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noguera, Michael Anthony

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Green, Anthony Charles