This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/07/2022 at 17:01:11 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Noel Mondragon

Case Summary

On 02/07/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Noel Mondragon. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0714

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Mondragon, Noel Corchado

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Her, Lee

Rosenthal, Sara R

Defendant Attorneys

Coughlin, Michael

Page, Kathleen Coleen

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

02/07/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

02/07/2022: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

02/14/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Pre-Trial Services Program

02/14/2022: Pre-Trial Services Program

Pre-Trial Services Program

02/14/2022: Pre-Trial Services Program

Release Order

02/28/2022: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/28/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC166(a)(4): Willful Disobedience Of Court Order; Dism: Motion of the People

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Her, Lee; Defendant: Mondragon, Noel Corchado; Deputy Public Defender: Page, Kathleen Coleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Services Program

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Services Program

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCustody Status; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Her, Lee; Defendant: Mondragon, Noel Corchado; Deputy Public Defender: Page, Kathleen Coleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Charges; Charge Number: 002; PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Arrest Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC166(a)(4): Willful Disobedience Of Court Order; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: Mondragon, Noel Corchado; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Mondragon, Noel Corchado; Charge #: 002; Description: PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Mondragon, Noel Corchado; Charge #: 001; Description: PC166(a)(4): Willful Disobedience Of Court Order; Statute: 166(a)(4); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Page, Kathleen Coleen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Coughlin, Michael