Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/27/2020 at 12:33:36 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Nicolas Avalos

Case Summary

On 10/03/2016 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Nicolas Avalos. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David, Breen, Thomas P., Bissig, Louis F., Dougherty, Frank and Ash, Carol. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6667

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Los Banos Division

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Breen, Thomas P.

Bissig, Louis F.

Dougherty, Frank

Ash, Carol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Avalos, Nicolas Flores

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Toscano, Jeremiah Joseph

Diaz, Roy

Egan, Gerad Denis

Defendant Attorneys

Ward, Diamond Solange

Samrao, Ramnik S

Merced County Public Defender

Lyon, Paul J

Berger, Richard

 

Court Documents

Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

04/26/2019: Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

Monthly Payment Plan Setup - $45 Fee

04/13/2018: Monthly Payment Plan Setup - $45 Fee

Criminal: Minute Order

03/26/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/27/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/29/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/05/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/04/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/14/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/26/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/24/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/30/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/19/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/22/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Courtesy Notice - Notice to Appear

10/13/2016: Courtesy Notice - Notice to Appear

Complaint

10/03/2016: Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFTP - 20 Day Collection Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketCitation: Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • FinancialAvalos, Nicolas Flores; Transaction Assessment; $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMonthly Payment Plan Setup - $45 Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DispositionSentence; Charges; Charge Number: 002; VC21650(a): Failure To Keep To Right Side Of Road (TSE); Sentence; Fee Totals; $237.00; Fee Totals; $237.00; Comment; Comment: (Defendant to make payments of $25.00 per month starting 04/30/18)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC23152(e): Driving Under Influence of Drug; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 002; VC21650(a): Failure To Keep To Right Side Of Road (TSE); Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 002; VC21650(a): Failure To Keep To Right Side Of Road (TSE); No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • FinancialAvalos, Nicolas Flores; Transaction Assessment; $237.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketTime Waived for Sentencing; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Avalos, Nicolas Flores

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Samrao, Ramnik S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant: Avalos, Nicolas Flores; Deputy Public Defender: Lyon, Paul J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Bissig, Louis F.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Lyon, Paul J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Lyon, Paul J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC23152(e): Driving Under Influence of Drug; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; VC21650(a): Failure To Keep To Right Side Of Road (TSE); Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Avalos, Nicolas Flores

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourtesy Notice - Notice to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/04/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Avalos, Nicolas Flores; Charge #: 002; Description: VC21650(a): Failure To Keep To Right Side Of Road (TSE); Statute: 21650(a); Level: Infraction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/04/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Avalos, Nicolas Flores; Charge #: 001; Description: VC23152(e): Driving Under Influence of Drug; Statute: 23152(e); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ward, Diamond Solange

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lyon, Paul J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samrao, Ramnik S