This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/17/2022 at 18:01:24 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Michael Subjack

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Michael Subjack. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Moranda, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0262

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Moranda, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Subjack, Michael Eugene

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Colby, Travis

Defendant Attorney

Page, Kathleen Coleen

 

Court Documents

Petition Revocation PRCS - PC3455

01/13/2022: Petition Revocation PRCS - PC3455

Criminal: Minute Order

01/14/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/18/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

02/18/2022: Release Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • DispositionSentence; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC3455(a): Revocation-Post Release Community Supervision; Sentence; Comment; Comment: (PRCS is reinstated)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC3455(a): Revocation-Post Release Community Supervision; Found True by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Sentencing; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketViolation Supervision; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation Supervision; Original Type: Violation Supervision; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant: Subjack, Michael Eugene; Deputy Public Defender: Page, Kathleen Coleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC3455(a): Revocation-Post Release Community Supervision; Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: PRCS; Original Type: Arraignment: PRCS; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant: Subjack, Michael Eugene; Deputy Public Defender: Page, Kathleen Coleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Revocation PRCS - PC3455

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Subjack, Michael Eugene; Charge #: 001; Description: PC3455(a): Revocation-Post Release Community Supervision; Statute: 3455(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Page, Kathleen Coleen