This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/14/2022 at 18:01:59 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Michael Subjack

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Michael Subjack. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0176

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Subjack, Michael Eugene

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rosenthal, Sara R

Colby, Travis

Defendant Attorneys

Coughlin, Michael

Page, Kathleen Coleen

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

01/10/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

01/10/2022: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

01/14/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/18/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

02/18/2022: Release Order

Collection Statement

02/22/2022: Collection Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketFirearms Relinquishment Hearing; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketTranscript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • FinancialSubjack, Michael Eugene; Transaction Assessment; $710.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Collections Statement Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DispositionProbation; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC666.5: Receiving Stolen Property, Motor Vehicle With Prior; Probation; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 02/18/2022; Term Type: Upper; Term: 4 Years; Suspended: 4 Years; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 43 Days; Conduct Credit: 42 Days; Comment: Count 1, Felony PC1170(h) Sentnece; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 02/18/2022; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 85 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 43 Days; Conduct Credit: 42 Days; Comment: Count 1, Felony; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 02/18/2022; Term: 2 Years; End Date: 02/17/2024; Status; Status: Active; Date: 02/18/2022; Fee Totals; $40.00; $30.00; Fee Totals; $70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC666.5: Receiving Stolen Property, Motor Vehicle With Prior; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC666.5: Receiving Stolen Property, Motor Vehicle With Prior; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • FinancialSubjack, Michael Eugene; Transaction Assessment; $70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketDefense Counsel Concurred in Defendants Plea or Admission

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Sentencing; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant: Subjack, Michael Eugene; Deputy Public Defender: Page, Kathleen Coleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant: Subjack, Michael Eugene; Deputy Public Defender: Page, Kathleen Coleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC666.5: Receiving Stolen Property, Motor Vehicle With Prior; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: Subjack, Michael Eugene; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Subjack, Michael Eugene; Charge #: 001; Description: PC666.5: Receiving Stolen Property, Motor Vehicle With Prior; Statute: 666.5; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Page, Kathleen Coleen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Coughlin, Michael