This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 10/27/2021 at 17:01:29 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Mariah Dominguez

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Mariah Dominguez. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Shaver, Donald, Lo, Paul and Moranda, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4749

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Shaver, Donald

Lo, Paul

Moranda, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Dominguez, Mariah

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Serratto, Matthew Travers

Silveira, Nicole A.

Min, Thomas Keynes

Colacito, Anthony Michael

Defendant Attorneys

Reed, Katharine

Boortz, Kimberly Ann

Andrade, Vincent

Page, Kathleen Coleen

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

09/29/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

09/29/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

10/01/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/08/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/12/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/13/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/26/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Dominguez, Mariah; Deputy Public Defender: Boortz, Kimberly Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Dominguez, Mariah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Dominguez, Mariah; Deputy Public Defender: Boortz, Kimberly Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colacito, Anthony Michael; Defendant: Dominguez, Mariah; Deputy Public Defender: Page, Kathleen Coleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC69: Obstruct/Resist Executive Officer; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC242: Battery; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Dominguez, Mariah; Deputy Public Defender: Reed, Katharine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Serratto, Matthew Travers; Defendant: Dominguez, Mariah; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Dominguez, Mariah; Charge #: 002; Description: PC242: Battery; Statute: 242; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Dominguez, Mariah; Charge #: 001; Description: PC69: Obstruct/Resist Executive Officer; Statute: 69; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reed, Katharine

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Page, Kathleen Coleen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent