Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/12/2020 at 17:17:33 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Justin Ward

Case Summary

On 12/10/2018 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Justin Ward. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Slocum, Steven, Moranda, David, Kirihara, John and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6467

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Los Banos Division

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Slocum, Steven

Moranda, David

Kirihara, John

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Ward, Justin Scott

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nored, Thane

Rosenthal, Sara R

Defendant Attorneys

Rodriguez, Adam J

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

09/06/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/04/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/20/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/09/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/17/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/18/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

02/13/2019: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/13/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/16/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

12/12/2018: CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

Complaint

12/10/2018: Complaint

Notice of Hearing

06/11/2019: Notice of Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketCitation: Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; HS11377: Possession of Controlled Substance; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 002; HS11364: Possession of paraphernalia for controlled substance; Dism: Motion of the People

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Nored, Thane; Defendant: Ward, Justin Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: Ward, Justin Scott; Contract Public Defender: Rodriguez, Adam J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketRelease: O/R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Charges; Charge Number: 001; HS11377: Possession of Controlled Substance; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; HS11364: Possession of paraphernalia for controlled substance; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant - Video; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: Ward, Justin Scott; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourtesy Notice - Notice to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Ward, Justin Scott; Charge #: 002; Description: HS11364: Possession of paraphernalia for controlled substance; Statute: 11364; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Ward, Justin Scott; Charge #: 001; Description: HS11377: Possession of Controlled Substance; Statute: 11377; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rosenthal, Sara R

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nored, Thane