This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 02/24/2021 at 10:47:43 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Joshua A. Rios

Case Summary

On 01/10/2020 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Joshua A Rios. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1-05

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Rios, Joshua

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Margain, Andre Carlos

Madayag, Kimberly

Compton, Misty

Defendant Attorneys

Noguera, Michael Anthony

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Petition Revocation PRCS - PC3455

01/10/2020: Petition Revocation PRCS - PC3455

Criminal: Minute Order

01/13/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/15/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/22/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/29/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/13/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: VOP; Original Type: Arraignment: VOP; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Rios, Joshua; Deputy Public Defender: Noguera, Michael Anthony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DispositionProbation; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC3455(a): Revocation-Post Release Community Supervision; Probation; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 01/29/2020; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 120 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 22 Days; Conduct Credit: 22 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC3455(a): Revocation-Post Release Community Supervision; VOP Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC3455(a): Revocation-Post Release Community Supervision; Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation Supervision; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Rios, Joshua; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation Supervision; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation Supervision; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Rios, Joshua; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC3455(a): Revocation-Post Release Community Supervision; Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: PRCS; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Madayag, Kimberly; Defendant: Rios, Joshua; Deputy Public Defender: Noguera, Michael Anthony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Revocation PRCS - PC3455

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Rios, Joshua; Charge #: 001; Description: PC3455(a): Revocation-Post Release Community Supervision; Statute: 3455(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noguera, Michael Anthony

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent