Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/31/2020 at 01:27:19 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Joseph Gonzalez, III

Case Summary

On 04/07/2017 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Joseph Gonzalez, III. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David, Breen, Thomas P., Shaver, Donald and Kirihara, John. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******886A

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Los Banos Division

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Breen, Thomas P.

Shaver, Donald

Kirihara, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Gonzalez, Joseph, III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hinton, Brandon

Toscano, Jeremiah Joseph

Bakich, Donna

Defendant Attorneys

McMillan, Matthew Scott

Samrao, Ramnik S

Public Defender, Deputy

Noguera, Michael Anthony

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

12/17/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Courtesy Notice - Warrant Arraignment

10/03/2019: Courtesy Notice - Warrant Arraignment

Criminal: Minute Order

09/03/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/01/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/28/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/17/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/27/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/11/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Merced County DEJ Program Referral Form

07/03/2017: Merced County DEJ Program Referral Form

Criminal: Minute Order

07/03/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Courtesy Notice - Notice to Appear

04/14/2017: Courtesy Notice - Notice to Appear

Complaint

04/07/2017: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Citation; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourtesy Notice - Notice to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketCitation: Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof: Community Service; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWalk-In; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Gonzalez, Joseph, III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DispositionAmended Sentence; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC20002(a): Hit And Run-Fail to Stop; Sentence; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 07/03/2017; Term: 36 Months; End Date: 07/03/2020; Status; Status: Active; Date: 07/03/2017; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 01/29/2019; Programs; Community Service; Ordered; Party: Gonzalez, Joseph, III; Order Date: 07/03/2017; Complete By: 09/11/2017; Duration: 40 Hours; Fee Totals; $40.00; $30.00; $150.00; Fee Totals; $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketDismissal; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketDeferred Entry of Judgment; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMerced County DEJ Program Referral Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketTime Waived for Sentencing; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Bakich, Donna; Defendant: Gonzalez, Joseph, III; Deputy Public Defender: Samrao, Ramnik S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC20002(a): Hit And Run-Fail to Stop; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; VC16028(a): Fail to Provide Evid Financial Responsibility (POI); Not Guilty; Charge Number: 003; PC484(a): Theft:Prsonl Prop-Grand/Petty Theft (Specify); Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Gonzalez, Joseph, III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourtesy Notice - Notice to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Gonzalez, Joseph, III; Charge #: 003; Description: PC484(a): Theft:Prsonl Prop-Grand/Petty Theft (Specify); Statute: 484(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Gonzalez, Joseph, III; Charge #: 002; Description: VC16028(a): Fail to Provide Evid Financial Responsibility (POI); Statute: 16028(a); Level: Infraction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Gonzalez, Joseph, III; Charge #: 001; Description: VC20002(a): Hit And Run-Fail to Stop; Statute: 20002(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hinton, Brandon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Toscano, Jeremiah Joseph

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bakich, Donna