This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/16/2022 at 16:01:58 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Jose Iniguezvalenzuela

Case Summary

On 03/02/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Jose Iniguezvalenzuela. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hollman, James and Moranda, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1136

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hollman, James

Moranda, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendants

Iniguezvalenzuela, Jose

Iniguez Valenzuela, Jose Antonio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Margain, Andre Carlos

Her, Lee

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Page, Kathleen Coleen

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

03/02/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

03/02/2022: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

03/07/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Monthly Payment Plan Agreement

03/09/2022: Monthly Payment Plan Agreement

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketProgress Report; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketFirearms Relinquishment Hearing; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMonthly Payment Plan Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DispositionProbation with Program; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Probation with Program; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 03/07/2022; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 30 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 8 Days; Conduct Credit: 8 Days; Comment: Count 1, Misdemeanor; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 03/07/2022; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 03/06/2025; Status; Status: Active; Date: 03/07/2022; Programs; BTP: 52 Week Class; Ordered; Party: Iniguezvalenzuela, Jose; Order Date: 03/07/2022; Enroll by Date: 04/06/2022; Fee Totals; $220.00; Fee Totals; $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere; Charge Number: 002; PC166(a)(4): Willful Disobedience Of Court Order; Dism: Motion of the People

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • FinancialIniguezvalenzuela, Jose; Transaction Assessment; $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketFirearm Relinquishment Packet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketDefense Counsel Concurred in Defendants Plea or Admission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketPlea Certified by Clerk of the Court

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketRight to Trial by Jury Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCharges and Direct Consequence of Plea

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Sentencing; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Her, Lee; Defendant: Iniguezvalenzuela, Jose; Deputy Public Defender: Page, Kathleen Coleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Hollman, James; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC166(a)(4): Willful Disobedience Of Court Order; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Hollman, James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Hollman, James; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Iniguezvalenzuela, Jose; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Iniguezvalenzuela, Jose; Charge #: 002; Description: PC166(a)(4): Willful Disobedience Of Court Order; Statute: 166(a)(4); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Iniguezvalenzuela, Jose; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Her, Lee

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Margain, Andre Carlos